EP1970183 - Hidden airbag flap, device and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2011/30] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhlmann, Klaus Feldstrasse 21 64569 Nauheim / DE | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel AG Patentrecht, A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/38] | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel GmbH Patentrecht, A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001106.7 | 22.01.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | DE20071011842 | 12.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011842 | [2008/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1970183 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1970183 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970183 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C37/00, B60R21/215 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
B29C43/183 (EP);
B60R21/2165 (EP);
B29L2022/027 (EP);
B29L2031/3005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | Nichtsichtbare Airbagklappe, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2008/38] | English: | Hidden airbag flap, device and method for its production | [2008/38] | French: | Clapet d'airbag invisible, dispositif et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2008 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IE | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | LU | 22.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LU | 22.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]EP0428935 (TIP ENG GROUP INC [US]); | [X]EP0586222 (PLASTIC MOLD TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [X]EP0639481 (TIP ENG GROUP INC [US]); | [AX]FR2721877 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]); | [AX]DE19651532 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]); | [X]EP0791508 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]US6109645 (TOTANI CHIHARU [JP], et al); | [A]WO0202302 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US], et al); | [DA]DE10149038 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A]WO03035435 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al); | [A]DE10308969 (LEAR CORP [US]) | by applicant | EP0487753 | DE10149038 |