Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1920743

EP1920743 - Air formed fibrous web [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/20]Apparatus and form for making an air formed fibrous web
[2012/10]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[2012/36]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Venturino, Michael B.
2124 Omega Drive
Appleton WI 54915 / US
02 / Daniels, Susan J.
3401 Knox Lane
Neenah WI 54956 / US
03 / Milanowski, Steven P.
1335 Avenida Pantera
San Marcos CA 92069 / US
 [2008/20]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2015/45]
Former [2012/36]Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/20]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date08001169.510.06.2003
[2008/20]
Priority number, dateUS2002020792930.07.2002         Original published format: US 207929
[2008/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1920743
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1920743
Date:06.08.2008
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1920743
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1920743
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/532
[2012/10]
Former International [2008/20]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2015/45]
Former [2008/20]DE,  FR,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftgeformtes Fasernetz[2012/10]
English:Air formed fibrous web[2012/10]
French:Ame fibreuse à formation d'air[2012/10]
Former [2008/20]Vorrichtung und Form zur Herstellung eines luftgeformten Fasernetzes
Former [2008/20]Apparatus and form for making an air formed fibrous web
Former [2008/20]Appareil et formule pour fabriquer une âme fibreuse à formation d'air
Examination procedure05.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/13]
10.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2012Fee for grant paid
24.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03736996.4  / EP1524955
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030736996) is  25.07.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
 02  31.05.2013  07.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Egeröd, Lisbeth
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
 02  31.05.2013   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Egeröd, Lisbeth
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
11.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.02.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.05.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
24.09.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition31.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0654/15
23.06.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
FR01.07.2013
[2014/24]
Former [2013/22]NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
Former [2013/12]SE05.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0700673  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 33, line 47 - column 34, line 5; figure 23 *;
 [X]US4059114  (RICHARDS SHIRLEY T) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-4; claims 19,20 *;
 [X]WO0234188  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 10, line 16 - line 29; figure 2B *;
 [X]US5451442  (PIENIAK HEINZ A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 9, line 29 - line 41; figure 13 *;
 [X]EP1210925  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013]; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0383616  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,4 *
by applicantUS5466409
 US4666647
 US4761258
 US6330735
 US4927582
 US20010947128
OppositionEP0788874
 EP1008333
 US3860002
 GB2354449
 US5795344
 EP1210925
 US4685915
 GB2191098