Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970862

EP1970862 - Method for generating a sequence of characters and/or symbols in a format similar to human handwriting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
meiller direct GmbH
Gutenbergstrasse 1 - 5
92421 Schwandorf / DE
[2008/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Mändl, Michael
Kreuzfelder Strasse 1
92421 Schwandorf / DE
02 / Wehner, Christian
Baumannstrasse 2
92224 Amberg / DE
03 / Feller, Martin
Clemensstrasse 2
93413 Cham / DE
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Glück, Martin , et al
Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger
Postfach 10 08 26
93008 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Glück, Martin , et al
Postfach 100826
93008 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date08001482.226.01.2008
[2008/38]
Priority number, dateDE2007101178512.03.2007         Original published format: DE102007011785
[2008/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1970862
Date:17.09.2008
Language:DE
[2008/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1970862
Date:03.06.2009
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/20
[2009/23]
Former International [2008/38]G06T11/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/06]
Former [2008/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer Zeichen- und/oder Symbolfolge in einem der menschlichen Handschrift ähnlichen Format[2008/38]
English:Method for generating a sequence of characters and/or symbols in a format similar to human handwriting[2008/38]
French:Procédé de générer une séquence de caractères et/ou symboles dans un format similaire à l'écriture humaine[2008/38]
Examination procedure04.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/28]
10.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6958755  (DICKENS JAMES EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 5, column 2, line 54 - page 6, column 3, line 36 *;
 [A]US6298154  (COK RONALD S [GB]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,4-6,16-20 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 24 *;
 [A]DE19512185  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 5,9 * * page 7, line 13 - line 32 * * page 7, line 33 - line 42 *