Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1953527

EP1953527 - Sample analyzer and computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
[2017/02]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandoori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagai, Takaaki
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
02 / Narisada, Noriyuki
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
03 / Fukuma, Daigo
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
04 / Imazu, Masanori
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
 [2018/11]
Former [2017/02]01 / Nagai, Takaaki
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
02 / Narisada, Noriyuki
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
03 / Fukuma, Daigo
c/o Sysmex Corporation
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
Former [2008/32]01 / Nagai, Takaaki
c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
02 / Narisada, Noriyuki
c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
03 / Fukuma, Daigo
c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/02]
Former [2008/32]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08001713.030.01.2008
[2008/32]
Priority number, dateJP2007002252301.02.2007         Original published format: JP 2007022523
JP2007009522630.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007095226
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1953527
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1953527
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1953527
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/12, G01N15/14, G01N33/49
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/02]
Former [2008/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Probenanalysegerät und Computerprogrammprodukt[2008/32]
English:Sample analyzer and computer program product[2008/32]
French:Analyseur d'échantillon et produit de programme informatique[2008/32]
Examination procedure06.11.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
18.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2016Fee for grant paid
25.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16199291.2  / EP3153841
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.10.2017  16.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  01.06.2018  14.06.2018  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Beckman Coulter GmbH
Europark
Fichtenhain B 13
47807 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [2018/29]
Former [2018/22]
Opponent(s)01  10.10.2017  16.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/46]
Opponent(s)01  10.10.2017   
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
17.11.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2018
12.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
17.04.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
23.07.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2008
AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/36]ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0679889  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 9, line 31 - column 12, line 29 * * figure 1 * [I] 2-7,10-20;
 [A]US2003215890  (ORNSTEIN LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] *;
 [A]JP2006292738  (SYSMEX CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1033573  (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
by applicantJP2003344393
 EP0679889
 US2003215890
 JP2006292738
 EP1033573
OppositionUS5288374
 JPS6073360
 JPH073360  * - English translation *
 EP0679889
 EP1376135
 JP2007022523
 JP2007095226
    - Beckman Coulter, "Coulter® LH700 Series Body Fluids Application", Operator's Guide 731113A, (20040900), pages 1 - 48, XP055429382
    - Beckman Coulter, "Coulter® LH700 Series System", Reference manual 4277248C, (20031000), XP055429420
    - AULESA C. et al., "Use of the Advia 120 hematology analyzer in the differential cytologic analysis of biological fluids (cerebrospinal, peritoneal, pleural, pericardial, synovial, and others).", Laboratory Hematology, (20030000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 214 - 224, XP055429430
    - KRESIE L. et al., "Performance evaluation of the application of body fluids on the Sysmex XE-2100 series automated hematology analyzer", Laboratory Hematology, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 24 - 30, XP055429433

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1532/LH96.04067
    - HARRIS et al., "Performance Evaluation of the ADVIA 2120 HematologyAnalyzer: An International Multicenter Clinical Trial", Laboratory Hematology, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 62 - 70, XP055429435

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1532/LH96.04064
    - ANDREWS J. et al., "An evaluation of the cell-dyn 3200 for counting cells in cerebrospinal and other body fluids", Laboratory Hematology, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 98 - 106, XP055429436

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1532/LH96.04071
    - Brown W. et al, "Validation of Body Fluid Analysis on the Coulter LH 750", Laboratory Hematology, (20030000), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 155 - 159, XP055429438
    - Beckman Coulter, "LH 750 Body Fluid Application, Software Revision 2B3 and 2C2", Technical Update. Miami Technical support, (20050131), pages 1 - 14, XP055429448