EP1954063 - Apparatus and method for camera calibration, and vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-chi Moriguchi City, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Yohei Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5-2, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
Kano, Hiroshi Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5-2, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
Okuda, Kozo Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5-2, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 04 /
Asari, Keisuke Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5-2, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001829.4 | 31.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | JP20070022630 | 01.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007022630 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1954063 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1954063 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H04N17/002 (EP,US);
G06T7/80 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kamerakalibrierung sowie Fahrzeug | [2008/32] | English: | Apparatus and method for camera calibration, and vehicle | [2008/32] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'étalonnage d'une caméra et véhicule | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1968011 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [E] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043]; figures 8-10; claim 1 * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082] *; | [X]US6816187 (IWAI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6437823 (ZHANG ZHENGYOU [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1378790 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0089]; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | JP2006287892 | JP2006148745 | JP2004342067 |