blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1988379

EP1988379 - Testing device and method for air flow noises [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2016  [2016/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG
Porscheplatz 1
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2010/13]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porscheplatz 1
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ochs, Jürgen
Kastanienweg 5
71297 Moensheim / DE
 [2008/45]
Application number, filing date08001996.102.02.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateDE2007102087804.05.2007         Original published format: DE102007020878
[2008/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988379
Date:05.11.2008
Language:DE
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988379
Date:10.11.2010
[2010/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2010
ClassificationIPC:G01M17/007, G01M3/24, // G01M9/00
[2010/45]
CPC:
G01M17/007 (EP,US); G01M3/24 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/45]G01M17/007, G01M3/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Prüfung von Umströmungsgeräuschen[2008/45]
English:Testing device and method for air flow noises[2008/45]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'essai pour bruits d'écoulement[2008/45]
Examination procedure18.06.2009Observations by third parties
20.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
15.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/49]
29.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004068085  (FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN INF [DE], et al) [Y] 6,9,13,14 * page 5, lines 1-25; claims 1,5,52 * * page 8, line 24 - line 26 * * page 19, line 1 - line 8 *;
 [Y]DE20320885U  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] , [0014]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE102005037841  (FOERDERUNG ANGEWANDTER INFORMA [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,10-13,15,16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0008] , [0032] , [0037]; figures 1b,7b *;
 [Y]  - DOBLER D ET AL, "Perspectives of the acoustic camera", INTER NOISE ENVIRONMENTAL NOISE CONTROL. THE 2005 CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION ON NOISE CONTROL ENGINEERING,, (20050807), pages 1 - 8, XP003025022 [Y] 1,2,7,8 * page 1, line 22 - line 25; figure 5 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 5; figure 5 *
ExaminationUS2002059832
 US2006137439
by applicantDE20320885U
otherWO2004068085
 DE20320885U
 DE102005037841
    - DOBLER D. AND G. HEILMANN, "Perspectives of the acoustic camera", INTER NOISE ENVIRONMENTAL NOISE CONTROL, (20050807), pages 1 - 8, XP003025022
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.