Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1939668

EP1939668 - Progressive spectacle lens with low magnification differences [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
Elsenheimerstrasse 33
80687 München / DE
[2012/48]
Former [2008/27]For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstrasse 43
80469 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Welk, Andrea
Otkerstr. 7
81547 München / DE
02 / Baumbach, Peter
Schönstrasse 20
81543 München / DE
03 / Haimerl, Walter
Thalkirchnerstrasse 78a
80337 München / DE
04 / Pfeiffer, Herbert
Georg-Hann-Strasse 16
81247 München / DE
05 / Altheimer, Helmut
An der Halde 2
87650 Lauchdorf / DE
06 / Dorsch, Rainer
Olivierstrasse 15A
81477 München / DE
07 / Esser, Georg
Säulingstr. 22
80686 München / DE
 [2017/20]
Former [2008/27]01 / Welk, Andrea
Ottkerstrasse 7
81547 München / DE
02 / Baumbach, Peter
Schönstrasse 20
81543 München / DE
03 / Haimerl, Walter
Thalkirchnerstrasse 78a
80337 München / DE
04 / Pfeiffer, Herbert
Georg-Hann-Strasse 16
81247 München / DE
05 / Altheimer, Helmut
An der Halde 2
87650 Lauchdorf / DE
06 / Dorsch, Rainer
Olivierstrasse 15A
81477 München / DE
07 / Esser, Georg
Madelsederstrasse 17
81735 München / DE
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/20]
Former [2008/27]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08002475.525.04.2001
[2008/27]
Priority number, dateDE200012024025.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10020240
DE200012024425.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10020244
DE200012104728.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10021047
WO2001DE0018817.01.2001         Original published format: PCT/DE01/00188
[2008/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1939668
Date:02.07.2008
Language:DE
[2008/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1939668
Date:17.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02
[2008/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2017/20]
Former [2009/11]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2008/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Progressives Brillenglas mit geringen Vergrößerungsunterschieden[2008/27]
English:Progressive spectacle lens with low magnification differences[2008/27]
French:Verre de lunette progressif avec des différences d'agrandissement réduites[2008/27]
Examination procedure24.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
21.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
17.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.04.2017Fee for grant paid
06.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination02.08.2013Appeal received No.  T2420/13
11.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
02.08.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/32]
21.09.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/39]
08.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01940190.0  / EP1277075
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010940190) is  08.07.2005
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
19.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
05.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
05.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
18.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
17.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
20.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.10.2014
[2014/48]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
[2018/15]
Former [2017/50]ES17.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0809126  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DA] 1-7 * column 4, line 14 - column 9, line 10; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0627645  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 9 *
by applicantEP0809126