|
23.03.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Rule 23 - Annex A |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Rule 23 - Annex C |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |