Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1959623

EP1959623 - Multi-media digital interface method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/34]Multi-media digital interface systems and methods
[2016/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semtech Canada Corporation
4281 Harvester Road
Burlington, ON L7L 5M4 / CA
[2013/28]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Semtech Canada, Inc.
4281 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7L 5M4 / CA
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
Gennum Corporation
4281 Harvester Road
Burlington, Ontario L7L 5M4 / CA
Former [2008/34]For all designated states
GENNUM CORPORATION
970 Fraser Drive Burlington
Ontario L7L 5P5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Shakiba, Mahammad H.
44 Brimwood Cres.
Richmond Hill
Ontario L4B 4B6 / CA
02 / Hudson, John
2314 Homer Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 4V4 / CA
03 / McDougall, Jack
6677 Harmony Hill
Mississauga Ontario L5W 1S9 / CA
04 / Rofheart, Martin
2431 Nottingham Drive
Falls Church Virginia 22043 / CA
05 / Lynch, David L.
1231, Appleford Lane
Burlongton Ontario L7P 3M1 / CA
 [2016/31]
Former [2008/34]01 / Shakiba, Mahammad H.
44 Brimwood Cres. Richmond Hill
Ontario L4B 4B6 / CA
02 / Hudson, John
2314 Homer Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 4V4 / CA
03 / McDougall, Jack
6677 Harmony Hill
Mississauga Ontario L5W 1S9 / CA
04 / Rofheart, Martin
2431 Nottingham Drive
Falls Church Virginia 22043 / CA
05 / Lynch, David L.
1231, Appleford Lane
Burlongton Ontario L7P 3M1 / CA
Representative(s)Weber-Bruls, Dorothée , et al
Jones Day
Nextower
Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2016/31]
Former [2008/34]Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08002881.415.02.2008
[2008/34]
Priority number, dateUS20070901777P16.02.2007         Original published format: US 901777 P
US20070939403P22.05.2007         Original published format: US 939403 P
US20070956394P17.08.2007         Original published format: US 956394 P
[2008/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1959623
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1959623
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1959623
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/02
[2008/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/31]
Former [2008/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Digitales Multimedia-Schnittstellenverfahren[2016/09]
English:Multi-media digital interface method[2016/09]
French:Procédé d'interface numérique multimédia[2016/09]
Former [2008/34]Digitale Multimedia-Schnittstellensysteme und -verfahren
Former [2008/34]Multi-media digital interface systems and methods
Former [2008/34]Systèmes et procédés d'interface numérique multimédia
Examination procedure15.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/34]
02.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.05.2016Fee for grant paid
09.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
30.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2015
Opposition(s)04.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2008
AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CY03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE15.02.2017
LU15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU15.02.2008
AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE15.02.2017
LU15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE15.02.2017
LU15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE15.02.2017
LU15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
LU15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT03.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006077778  (TATUM JIMMY A [US], et al) [I] 1-60 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 3-8A *;
 [A]  - HUDSON J ET AL, "3G: THE EVOLUTION OF THE SERIAL DIGITAL INTERFACE (SDI)", SMPTE - MOTION IMAGING JOURNAL, SOCIETY OF MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (20061101), vol. 115, no. 11/12, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 472 - 481, XP001502909 [A] 1-60 * page 472 - page 474, column l *
 [A]  - HASHEMI H, "DIFFERENTIAL-TO-SINGLE-ENDED CONVERTER", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (19960314), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0012-7515, page 96, XP000592123 [A] 1-60 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MICHEL N ET AL, "A novel method to linearise phase response of single-ended to differential converters for high bit rates", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 2004 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL FORT WORTH, TX, USA JUNE 6-11, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040606), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2004.1339200, ISBN 978-0-7803-8331-9, pages 1191 - 1194, XP010728353 [A] 1-60 * page 1193 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2004.1339200
ExaminationUS2005063707
by applicantUS2003174778