Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1933395

EP1933395 - Complexes of form L2IrX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 02.08.2017  [2017/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of Princeton University
P.O. Box 36
Princeton, NJ 08544 / US
For all designated states
The University of Southern California
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Thompson, Mark E.
4447 Pepper Creek Way
Anaheim, CA 92807 / US
02 / Djurovich, Peter
1723 1/2 E. Second Street
Long Beach CA 90007 / US
03 / Lamansky, Sergey
12555 Everton Avenue
Apple Valley, MN 55214 / US
04 / Murphy, Drew
57 Irving Street, 2nd floor
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
05 / Kwong, Raymond
1 Burr Court Plainsboro
New Jersey 08536 / US
06 / Abdel-Razzaq, Feras
837 W. 37th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90089 / US
07 / Forrest, Stephen R.
336 Rock Creek Court
Ann Arbor MIchigan 48109 / US
08 / Baldo, Marc A.
Massachusetts Institute of Technology, ELE Dept., 77 Massachusetts Avenue, Room 12-3138
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
09 / Burrows, Paul
101105 Vaca Road
Kennewick, WA 99338 / US
 [2008/33]
Former [2008/25]01 / Thompson, Mark E.
4447 Pepper Creek Way
Anaheim, CA 92807 / US
02 / Djurovich, Peter
1723 1/2 E. Second Street
Long Beach CA 90007 / US
03 / Lamansky, Sergey
112 South Greenwood Boulevard, 2
Pasadena, CA 91102 / US
04 / Murphy, Drew
4122 Deeboyar Avenue, 20
Lakewood, CA 90712 / US
05 / Kwong, Raymond
1 Burr Court Plainsboro
New Jersey 08536 / US
06 / Abdel-Razzaq, Feras
837 W. 37th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90089 / US
07 / Forrest, Stephen R.
336 Rock Creek Court
Ann Arbor MIchigan 48109 / US
08 / Baldo, Marc A.
Princeton University Graduate College
Princeton, NJ 08544 / US
09 / Burrows, Paul
101105 Vaca Road
Kennewick, WA 99338 / US
Representative(s)Hansen, Norbert
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Hansen, Norbert
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2012/18]Kopf, Korbinian Paul
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2008/25]Kiriczi, Sven Bernhard
Schneiders & Behrendt Mühlthaler Strasse 91 D
81475 München / DE
Application number, filing date08003327.729.11.2000
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateUS1999045234601.12.1999         Original published format: US 452346
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1933395
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1933395
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/30, C09K11/06, H05B33/14
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2008/25]
TitleGerman:Komplex der Formel L2IrX[2008/25]
English:Complexes of form L2IrX[2008/25]
French:Complexes de formule L2lrX[2008/25]
Examination procedure09.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2011Fee for grant paid
18.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00980863.5  / EP1252803
Divisional application(s)EP10181664.3  / EP2278637
EP10181674.2  / EP2270895
EP15156358.2  / EP2911211
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000980863) is  15.05.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012  05.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  24.02.2012  19.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Sumitomo Chemical Company Ltd.
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 03  27.02.2012  06.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [2017/31]
Former [2016/23]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012  05.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 02  24.02.2012  19.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Sumitomo Chemical Company Ltd.
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Opponent's representative
Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 03  27.02.2012  06.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollah, Dorothee
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012  05.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
 02  24.02.2012  02.03.2012  WITHDRAWN
Sumitomo Chemical Company Ltd.
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Opponent's representative
Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 03  27.02.2012  06.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2012/14]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
 02  24.02.2012   
Sumitomo Chemical Company Ltd.
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Opponent's representative
Duckworth, Timothy John
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 03  27.02.2012   
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
30.03.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.09.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0437/14
30.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
26.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0437/14
28.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0437/14
22.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
16.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.05.2011
BE25.05.2011
CY25.05.2011
DK25.05.2011
FI25.05.2011
IT25.05.2011
SE25.05.2011
TR25.05.2011
GR26.08.2011
ES05.09.2011
PT26.09.2011
IE29.11.2011
LU29.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2012/12]AT25.05.2011
BE25.05.2011
CY25.05.2011
DK25.05.2011
FI25.05.2011
SE25.05.2011
GR26.08.2011
ES05.09.2011
PT26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT25.05.2011
BE25.05.2011
CY25.05.2011
FI25.05.2011
SE25.05.2011
GR26.08.2011
ES05.09.2011
PT26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY25.05.2011
FI25.05.2011
SE25.05.2011
GR26.08.2011
ES05.09.2011
PT26.09.2011
Former [2011/47]PT26.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0215645  (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO0202714  (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5703436  (FORREST STEPHEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 7 *;
 [X]  - CALOGERO G. ET AL, "ABSORPTION SPECTRA; LUMINESCENCE PROPERTIES, AND ELECTROCHEMICAL BEHAVIOR OF CYCLOMETALATED IRIDIUM (III) AND RHODIUM (III) COMPLEXES WITH A BIS(PYRIDYL)TRIAZOLE LIGAND", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (19950201), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 541 - 545, XP002231208 [X] 1-15 * see [Ir(ppy)2(dpt-HH2)]+ and [Ir(ppy)2(bpy)]+;; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00107a004
 [X]  - MARCO DI G ET AL, "LUMINESCENT MONONUCLEAR AND DINUCLEAR IRIDIUM(III) CYCLOMETALATED COMPLEXES IMMOBILIZED IN A POLYMERIC MATRIX AS SOLID-STATE OXYGEN SENSORS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19981201), vol. 70, no. 23, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 5019 - 5023, XP000799212 [X] 1-15 * compounds 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac980234p
 [X]  - NEVE F ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, STRUCTURE, PHOTOPHYSICAL PROPERTIES, AND REDOX BEHAVIOUR OF CYCLOMETALATED COMPLEXES OF IRIDIUM(III) WITH FUNCTIONALIZED 2,2'-BIPYRIDINES", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (19990517), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 2250 - 2258, XP002295198 [X] 1-15 * table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic981308i
 [X]  - WILDE A P ET AL, "Resolution and analysis of the components in dual emission of mixed-chelate/ ortho-metalate complexes of Iridium(III)", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1991), vol. 95, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 629 - 634, XP002315391 [X] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100155a026
by applicantWO9619792
 WO9733296
 WO9621006
 US5694626
 US6046543
 US6045930
 US5811833
 US6013982
 US6048630
 US5757139
 US5834893
 US5844363
 US6091195
 US5917280
 US5986401
 US5861219
 US6125226
 US6111902
 US5932895
 WO9748115
 WO9748139
 WO9850989
 US5874803
 US5707745
 US5703436
 US5757026
    - C.H. CHEN; J. SHI; C.W. TANG, "Recent developments in molecular organic electroluminescent materials", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, (1997), vol. 125, pages 1 - 48,
    - U. BRACKMANN, "Lambdachrome Laser Dyes", LAMBDA PHYSIK, (1997),
    - M. A. BALDO ET AL., "High efficiency phosphorescent emission from organic electroluminescent devices", NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, pages 151 - 154,
    - M. A. BALDO; M. E. THOMPSON; S.R. FORREST, AN ANALYTIC MODEL OF TRIPLET-TRIPLET ANNIHILATION IN ELECTROPHOSPHORESCENT DEVICES, (1999),
 US19970814976
 US19960771815