blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2098665

EP2098665 - Sliding window or sliding door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROTO FRANK AG
Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
[2009/37]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2009/37]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/37]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date08004122.106.03.2008
[2009/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2098665
Date:09.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2098665
Date:25.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2008
ClassificationIPC:E05D1/04, E05D15/10
[2009/37]
CPC:
E05D1/04 (EP); E05D15/1013 (EP); E05D15/1015 (EP);
E05D2015/1031 (EP); E05F11/145 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:Schiebefenster bzw. Schiebetür[2009/37]
English:Sliding window or sliding door[2009/37]
French:Fenêtre ou porte coulissante[2009/37]
Examination procedure17.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
02.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2013Fee for grant paid
13.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2009
Opposition(s)26.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2008
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
GR25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/31]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
GR25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2016/29]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2016/27]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2016/25]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2016/12]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2015/24]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2015/07]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
LU06.03.2014
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/39]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/36]EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
Former [2014/25]FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI25.12.2013
HR25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT25.12.2013
NO25.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US6292981  (FORD JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 29 - line 48; figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [XY]DE959353  (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 15; figures 8-13 * [Y] 4,5,7-10;
 [DX]AT250208B  (WEBER WILHELM [DE]) [DX] 1,2 * page 2, line 3 - line 9; figures 1-3 *;
 [DY]EP0103725  (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]) [DY] 4,5,7-10 * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 1 *
by applicantEP0103725
 AT250208B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.