blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1972206

EP1972206 - Dye emulsion and emulgator compounds and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 02.05.2018  [2018/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensient Colors Europe GmbH
Geesthachter Strasse 103
21502 Geesthacht / DE
[2013/14]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Sensient Food Colors Germany GmbH & Co. KG
Geesthachter Strasse 103-105
21502 Geesthacht / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klingenberg, Andreas, Dr.
Waldstrasse 6
21465 Reinbek / DE
 [2008/39]
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[2018/18]
Former [2008/39]Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date08004244.307.03.2008
[2008/39]
Priority number, dateDE20072003800U14.03.2007         Original published format: DE 202007003800 U
[2008/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1972206
Date:24.09.2008
Language:DE
[2008/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1972206
Date:01.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/27]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1972206
Date:02.05.2018
Language:DE
[2018/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2008
ClassificationIPC:A23L5/44, A23L29/10
[2018/04]
CPC:
A23L2/58 (EP,US); A23C9/1307 (EP,US); A23D7/0053 (EP,US);
A23L5/44 (EP,US); A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/044, A23V2250/211 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/39]A23L1/275, A23L1/035
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/18]
Former [2008/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Farbstoff-Emulsion und Emulgatorzusammensetzung sowie deren Verwendung[2008/39]
English:Dye emulsion and emulgator compounds and their use[2008/39]
French:Emulsion de colorant et composition émulsifiante et leur utilisation[2008/39]
Examination procedure15.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
01.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2009Fee for grant paid
12.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.03.2010  14.04.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Chr. Hansen Natural Colors A/S
Bøge Allé 10-12
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  31.03.2010  26.04.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Rudolf Wild GmbH & Co. KG
Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115
69214 Eppelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2010  14.04.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Chr. Hansen Natural Colors A/S
Bøge Allé 10-12
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  31.03.2010  26.04.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Rudolf Wild GmbH & Co. KG
Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115
69214 Eppelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2010/19]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2010   
Chr. Hansen A/S
Boge Allé 10-12
2970 Horsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  31.03.2010    ADMISSIBLE
RUDOLF WILD GmbH & CO. KG
Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115
69214 Eppelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.05.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.11.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.01.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
10.02.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.03.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.03.2013Appeal received No.  T0688/13
13.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.03.2013Appeal received No.  T0688/13
13.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.07.2009
CZ01.07.2009
DK01.07.2009
EE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
HR01.07.2009
IE01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
LT01.07.2009
LV01.07.2009
MT01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
PL01.07.2009
RO01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
SI01.07.2009
SK01.07.2009
TR01.07.2009
BG01.10.2009
NO01.10.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
IS01.11.2009
PT01.12.2009
HU02.01.2010
LU07.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
GB07.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
AT07.03.2013
[2014/37]
Former [2011/25]CZ01.07.2009
DK01.07.2009
EE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
HR01.07.2009
IE01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
LT01.07.2009
LV01.07.2009
MT01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
PL01.07.2009
RO01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
SI01.07.2009
SK01.07.2009
BG01.10.2009
NO01.10.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
IS01.11.2009
BE31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2010/28]CZ01.07.2009
DK01.07.2009
EE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
HR01.07.2009
IE01.07.2009
LT01.07.2009
LV01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
PL01.07.2009
RO01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
SI01.07.2009
SK01.07.2009
BG01.10.2009
NO01.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
IS01.11.2009
Former [2010/19]EE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
HR01.07.2009
LT01.07.2009
LV01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
PL01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
SI01.07.2009
BG01.10.2009
NO01.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
IS01.11.2009
Former [2010/05]SI01.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0956779  (VESIFACT AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] - [0053] * * examples 3,6 * * claims 1-29 *;
 [DA]US2003129290  (FULLMER LINDA A [US], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [DXY]DE102005031467  (BASF AG [DE]) [DX] 1-24 * the whole document * [Y] 9,12,13,17-23;
 [DY]WO2007026271  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [DY] 9,12,13,17-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - SCHUBERT ET AL, "Product and Formulation Engineering of Emulsions", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, PART A, INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, XX, (20040901), vol. 82, no. 9, ISSN 0263-8762, pages 1137 - 1143, XP022536055 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1205/cerd.82.9.1137.44154
by applicantEP0956779
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.