Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1988380

EP1988380 - Sample taking device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEMÜ Gebrüder Müller Apparatebau GmbH & Co. KG
Fritz-Müller-Strasse 6-8
74653 Ingelfingen / DE
[2008/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Wiedmann, Michael
Rathausweg 33
88263 Horgenzell / DE
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Steimle, Josef
Dreiss Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Steimle, Josef
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date08004844.014.03.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateDE20072006417U04.05.2007         Original published format: DE 202007006417 U
[2008/45]
Previously filed application, dateDE20072006417U04.05.2007
[2008/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988380
Date:05.11.2008
Language:DE
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988380
Date:23.06.2010
[2010/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1988380
Date:15.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/22
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2010/50]
Former [2008/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Probenahmevorrichtung[2008/45]
English:Sample taking device[2008/45]
French:Dispositif de prélèvement d'échantillon[2008/45]
Examination procedure14.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
09.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2010Fee for grant paid
01.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE20316936U  (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102004045785  (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *;
 [AP]EP1798538  (HORIBA LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10356616  (IDONEUS ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
by applicantDE20316936U
 DE102004045785