Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1973364

EP1973364 - Method for enhancing data transmission efficiency for a radio resource control procedure for a wireless communications system and related apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.08.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
2nd Floor, The Axis
26 Cybercity
Ebene 72201 / MU
[2014/26]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
4th Floor, Unicorn Centre
18N Frere Felix De Valois Street
Port Louis / MU
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
P.O. Box 957 offshore incorporations centre Road Town
Tortola / VG
Inventor(s)01 / Kuo, Richard Lee-Chee
4F, No. 150 Li-Te Rd.
Peitou Taipei City / TW
 [2008/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/39]Schaeberle, Steffen
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date08005478.625.03.2008
[2008/39]
Priority number, dateUS20070896500P23.03.2007         Original published format: US 896500 P
[2008/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1973364
Date:24.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1973364
Date:02.12.2009
[2009/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1973364
Date:15.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/08, // H04W76/02
[2010/18]
Former International [2008/39]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Datenübertragungseffizienz für ein Funkressourcen-Steuerverfahren für ein drahtloses Kommunikationssystem und entsprechende Vorrichtung[2008/39]
English:Method for enhancing data transmission efficiency for a radio resource control procedure for a wireless communications system and related apparatus[2008/39]
French:Procédé pour améliorer l'efficacité de la transmission de données pour procédé de contrôle de ressources radio pour système de communications sans fil et appareil correspondant[2008/39]
Examination procedure25.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/39]
04.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2010Fee for grant paid
20.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.06.2011  21.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/30]
Opponent(s)01  15.06.2011  21.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
22.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition01.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0850/16
01.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.09.2010
BE15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
HU15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
IE25.03.2011
LU25.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT15.09.2010
BE15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
IE25.03.2011
LU25.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
Former [2013/42]AT15.09.2010
BE15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
IE25.03.2011
LU25.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
Former [2012/03]AT15.09.2010
BE15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/27]AT15.09.2010
BE15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/26]AT15.09.2010
CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]  - NOKIA ET AL, "Introduction of Enhanced CELL_FACH state", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-071012 ENHANCED CELL_FACH 25331-730_CR V04, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070220), vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Louis, USA; 20070220, XP050134005 [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [8.3.1.12] , [8.5.25] , [8.5.XX] , [8.5.YY] , [8.6.3.1B] , [8.6.3.XX] *
by applicant   - NOKIA ET AL., INTRODUCTION OF ENHANCED CELL FACH STATE, (20070220), vol. RAN WG2