Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1976242

EP1976242 - Method for controlling mobile communication device equipped with touch screen, communication device and method of executing functions thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/52]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-010 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Jong-Hwan
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
IP Group
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
02 / Lee, Sang Hyuck
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
IP Group
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
03 / Yoon, Mu Hy
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
IP Group
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
04 / Kim, Hee Soo
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
IP Group
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
 [2016/34]
Former [2008/40]01 / Kim, Jong-Hwan
c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
02 / Lee, Sang Hyuck
c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
03 / Yoon, Mu Hy
c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
04 / Kim, Hee Soo
c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR
Representative(s)Free, Rachel Alder , et al
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/34]Free, Rachel Alder , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2008/40]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date08005782.127.03.2008
[2008/40]
Priority number, dateKR2007003137530.03.2007         Original published format: KR 20070031375
KR2007010443717.10.2007         Original published format: KR 20070104437
[2008/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1976242
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1976242
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04M1/2745, // G06F3/0484, G06F3/0486, G06F3/0488
[2016/17]
Former International [2008/40]H04M1/247, H04M1/725, G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/34]
Former [2008/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung einer mobilen Kommunikationsvorrichtung mit Berührungsbildschirm, Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ausführung von Funktionen davon[2008/40]
English:Method for controlling mobile communication device equipped with touch screen, communication device and method of executing functions thereof[2008/40]
French:Procédé pour le contrôle d'un dispositif de communication mobile doté d'un écran tactile, dispositif de communication et procédé pour l'exécution des fonctions correspondantes[2008/40]
Examination procedure27.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/40]
09.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2016Fee for grant paid
13.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2009
Opposition(s)26.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2008
AT24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU27.03.2008
AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
LU27.03.2017
Former [2018/01]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT24.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9848554  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-40 * page 6, line 18 - page 20, line 6 * * figures 3-21 *;
 [X]EP1739533  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-40 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2005138630  (REYNOLDS FRANKLIN [US]) [X] 1-40 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0060] *
ExaminationWO2006117438
 US2004119763