Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1944616

EP1944616 - Battery residual quantity display method and electronic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2009/43]
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakashima, Ryoichi
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Sato, Hideyuki
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Tsuchiya, Yukio
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / Nawa, Kazuyasu
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2009/42]
Former [2008/29]01 / Nakashima, Ryoichi
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Hideyuki
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Tsuchiya, Yukio
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Nawa, Kazuyasu
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date08006119.520.02.2006
[2008/29]
Priority number, dateJP2005006781810.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005067818
[2008/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1944616
Date:16.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1944616
Date:19.11.2008
[2008/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1944616
Date:28.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36, G06F1/32, H01M10/48, // H01M10/42, H01M2/10
[2008/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/29]
TitleGerman:Anzeigeverfahren der Batterierestmenge und elektronische Ausrüstung[2008/29]
English:Battery residual quantity display method and electronic equipment[2008/29]
French:Procédé d'affichage de quantité résiduelle de batterie et équipement électronique[2008/29]
Examination procedure06.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2010Fee for grant paid
21.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06714087.1  / EP1857828
Divisional application(s)EP10002642.6  / EP2204661
Opposition(s)31.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE28.04.2010
CZ28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
EE28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
HU28.04.2010
LT28.04.2010
LV28.04.2010
PL28.04.2010
RO28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
SI28.04.2010
SK28.04.2010
TR28.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
BG28.07.2010
GR29.07.2010
IS28.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]BE28.04.2010
CZ28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
EE28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
LT28.04.2010
LV28.04.2010
PL28.04.2010
RO28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
SI28.04.2010
SK28.04.2010
TR28.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
BG28.07.2010
GR29.07.2010
IS28.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2013/42]BE28.04.2010
CZ28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
EE28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
LT28.04.2010
LV28.04.2010
PL28.04.2010
RO28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
SI28.04.2010
SK28.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
BG28.07.2010
GR29.07.2010
IS28.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/25]BE28.04.2010
CZ28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
EE28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
LT28.04.2010
LV28.04.2010
PL28.04.2010
RO28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
SI28.04.2010
SK28.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR29.07.2010
IS28.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[XA]JP2004147408  (CANON KK) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract * * figures 12-14 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0086] , [0091] - [0098] * [A] 11;
 [XA]US2005001629  (CHEN KUAN-HUA [TW]) [X] 1-10,12 * page 1, paragraphs 6,7 * * page 3, paragraph 32 * [A] 11;
 [XA]US2005001589  (EDINGTON LARRY G [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * page 1, paragraphs 4-6 * * page 3, paragraphs 27-32 * * figure 1 * [A] 11;
 [DA]JPH09297166  (SONY CORP) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-13 *;
 [T]  - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "BATTERY PACK SECURITY AND AUTHENTICATION IC FOR PORTABLE APPLICATIONS (bqSECURE?)", URL: http://focus.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/bq26150.pdf, (20081008), XP002498921 [T] 1-12 * page 1 * * page 5 * * page 11 - page 12 * * figure 2 *
by applicantJP2005067818
 JPH09297166
 JP2004310387