Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026481

EP2026481 - System and method for rejoining retransmissions of broadcast media [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2012  [2012/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Auerbach, Bradford
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / Kenagy, Jason, B.
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date08006302.731.03.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007083778613.08.2007         Original published format: US 837786
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026481
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
ClassificationInternational:H04H60/11, H04H60/65
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Erwiderung von Übertragungen von Rundfunkmedien[2009/08]
English:System and method for rejoining retransmissions of broadcast media[2009/08]
French:Système et procédé pour relier des retransmissions de support de diffusion[2009/08]
Examination procedure01.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/16]
09.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201104   M06   Not yet paid