Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023286

EP2023286 - Surface mesh matching for lens roll-off correction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2011  [2011/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Hung, Szepo Robert c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / Li, Jingquiang c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / Li, Hsiang-Tsun c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / Zhong, Xin c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date08006418.131.03.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2007083522007.08.2007         Original published format: US 835220
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023286
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023286
Date:02.09.2009
[2009/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/18]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Oberflächengewebeübereinstimmung für Filterempfindlichkeitskorrektur[2009/07]
English:Surface mesh matching for lens roll-off correction[2009/07]
French:Correspondance de grille de surface pour la correction d'affaiblissement de lentille[2009/07]
Examination procedure02.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
03.03.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/23]
20.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003234879  (WHITMAN CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-12,14,18-21,23,27-39 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0035] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] * * paragraph [0026] * [Y] 4,6-8,13,15-17,22,24-26;
 [XY]EP1251461  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,9-12,18-21,27-39 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] * [Y] 4,6-8,13,15-17,22,24-26;
 [A]US2003234864  (MATHERSON KEVIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0029] , [0044] - [0055] *;
 [A]EP1447977  (DIALOG SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  STEVE HILL, "X.1 Tri-linear Interpolation and X.2 Faster linear interpolation", GRAPHIC GEMS IV, Edited by Pauls S. Heckbert, (1994), pages 521 - 533, XP002536207 [Y] 4,6-8,13,15-17,22,24-26 * Section "Linear Interpolation" *
 [A]  YU W, "PRACTICAL ANTI-VIGNETTING METHODS FOR DIGITAL CAMERAS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20041101), vol. 50, no. 4, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 975 - 983, XP001224730 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2004.1362487
by applicantUS2003234879
 EP1251461