Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2107125

EP2107125 - Real-time PCR of targets on a micro-array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eppendorf Array Technologies SA (EAT)
Rue du Séminaire 20A
5000 Namur / BE
[2009/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Remacle, José
Chemin des Pierres 14
5020 Malonne / BE
02 / Alexandre, Isabelle
c/o 20A rue du seminaire
5000 Namur / BE
03 / De Roeck, Sven
323 avenue de la Couronne
1050 Bruxelles / BE
04 / Husar, Dieter
c/o 18 Hemmelmoor
22367 Hamburg / DE
05 / Zammatteo, Nathalie
c/o 20A rue du seminaire
5000 Namur / BE
06 / Koehn, Heinz
Poppenbütteler Chaussee 49A
22339 Hamburg / DE
 [2009/41]
Representative(s)Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/41]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08006466.031.03.2008
[2009/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2107125
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, B01L7/00, B01L3/00
[2009/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/41]
TitleGerman:Echtzeit-PCR von Targets auf einem Mikroarray[2009/41]
English:Real-time PCR of targets on a micro-array[2009/41]
French:PCR en temps réel de cibles sur un micro-réseau[2009/41]
Examination procedure07.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
24.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
27.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1788095  (EPPENDORF ARRAY TECH SA [BE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,16-18,21,26,27 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,28,29;
 [X]EP1788097  (EPPENDORF ARRAY TECH SA [BE]) [X] 26,27 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] *;
 [X]WO2008034896  (EPPENDORF ARRAY TECH SA [BE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-13,15-25,30,31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9320240  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 4,5,28,29 * claim - *;
 [A]WO03048391  (BIO3 RES SRL [IT], et al) [A] 32 * page 6, line 1 - line 30 *;
 [A]WO0058013  (ALPHAHELIX AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9849340  (CORBETT JOHN MICHAEL [AU], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4683195
 US6171785
 US6395518
 US5952202
 US5716784
 US5928907
 WO2006053770
 US5959098
 US5945334
 US5922591
 US6458526
 WO9727317
 WO9932660
 US6186659
 WO0177372
 US5445934
 DE19949735
 US3817837
 US3850752
 US3939350
 US3996345
 US4277437
 US4275149
 US4366241
 EP1200204
 EP1788098
    - LIU ET AL., J. MICROMECH.MICROENG., (2007), vol. 17, pages 2055 - 2064
    - HAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 19, pages 631 - 635
    - BOYER ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 297, pages 1160 - 2002
    - STIMPSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 11350 - 11353
    - THIEL ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 69, pages 4948 - 4956
    - CARUSO ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 69, pages 2043 - 2049
    - MCKENDRY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 9783 - 9788
    - OZSOZ ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 75, pages 2181 - 2197
    - MORENO-HAGELSIEB ET AL., SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B-CHEMICAL, (2004), vol. 98, pages 269 - 274
    - L. DREESEN ET AL., CHEM PHYS CHEM, (2004), vol. 5, pages 1719 - 1725
    - SANTA-LUCIA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI; USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 1460 - 1465
    - OWCZARZY ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 43, pages 3537 - 3554
 EP20070150423
 US20060526159
 EP20070112900