Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1993227

EP1993227 - Systems and methods for delivering information within a group communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2008/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Winchell, Diane
Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / Korecki, Jon
Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / Kirby, Miles
Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2008/47]
Representative(s)Condon, Neil , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Condon, Neil , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date08006575.811.04.2002
[2008/47]
Priority number, dateUS2001083526212.04.2001         Original published format: US 835262
[2008/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1993227
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1993227
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, // H04M3/487
[2008/47]
Designated contracting states[2009/42]
Former [2008/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren zur Ausgabe von Informationen in einem Gruppenkommunikationssystem[2008/47]
English:Systems and methods for delivering information within a group communications system[2008/47]
French:Systèmes et procédés pour fournir des informations dans un système de communication de groupe[2008/47]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02719500.7  / EP1380117
Divisional application(s)EP09010786.3  / EP2141854
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0075801  (M T OR ENTPR LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 20; figure 1 * * page 9, line 1 - line 24 *;
 [Y]WO9741654  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 8 - line 18 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 15 * * page 11, line 29 - page 14, line 19 *;
 [A]US5974414  (STANCZAK MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 21 - line 51 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 10 * * figure 4 *
by applicantUS6227412
 US6477150
 US20000518776