Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1988320

EP1988320 - Vibration isolating intermediary component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2013  [2013/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Asslar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Asslar / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hoffmann, Jörg
Gustav-Heinemann-Allee 3
97204 Höchsberg / DE
02 / Pankoke, Steffen, Dr.
Weinbergstrasse 13
97837 Erlenbach / DE
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Knefel, Cordula , et al
Patentanwältin
Postfach 1924
35529 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]Knefel, Cordula , et al
Patentanwältin, Postfach 1924
35529 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date08006587.331.03.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateDE2007101829218.04.2007         Original published format: DE102007018292
[2008/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988320
Date:05.11.2008
Language:DE
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988320
Date:18.08.2010
[2010/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:F16L27/11, F16L51/02, F04B37/14, F04B39/00, F04D29/60, F04D29/66
[2010/33]
Former International [2008/45]F16L27/11
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
TitleGerman:Schwingungsisolierendes Zwischenbauteil[2008/45]
English:Vibration isolating intermediary component[2008/45]
French:Composant intermédiaire isolant contre les oscillations[2008/45]
Examination procedure27.05.2010Observations by third parties
08.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/12]
29.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
13.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/15]
22.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4862697  (TUGAL HALIL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * column 1, line 11 - column 8, line 15; figures 1-11 * [I] 6;
 [X]US4835972  (TUGAL HALIL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * column 1, line 12 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]EP1580477  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [I] 1-5,8,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-9 *;
 [I]US2004226622  (HAYASHI KANEYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1,5,7 * the whole document *;
 [I]DD16517  (SYDOW HEINZ [DD]) [I] 1,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [I]DE10001509  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4862697
 US4835972
 EP1580477
 US2004226622
 JPH10252963
otherEP1580477
 DE10001509
 US4862697