Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2110020

EP2110020 - Oven and process to control the air-flow and air-leakages between two chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Food Solutions Bakel B.V.
Beekakker 11
5761 EN Bakel / NL
[2014/21]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
CFS Bakel B.V.
Beekakker 11
5761 EN Bakel / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Kuenen, Hendrikus Antonius Jacobus
De Kleffen 6
5825 DA Overloon / NL
 [2014/28]
Former [2009/43]01 / Kuenen, Hendrikus Antonius Jacobus
De Kleffen 6
5825 DA Overloon / NL
Representative(s)Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2009/43]Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date08007605.218.04.2008
[2009/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2110020
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2110020
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:A21B1/42, A21B1/48
[2009/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/43]
TitleGerman:Ofen und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Luftstroms und von Luftlecks zwischen zwei Kammern[2009/43]
English:Oven and process to control the air-flow and air-leakages between two chambers[2009/43]
French:Four et processus de contrôle du débit d'air et des fuites d'air entre deux chambres[2009/43]
Examination procedure21.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
09.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2014Fee for grant paid
08.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13186178.3  / EP2679097
EP17189015.5  / EP3335564
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.04.2015   
Marel Townsend Further Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2015/21]
Opponent(s)01  09.04.2015   
Marel Townsend Further Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
NL-GE Rijswijk / NL
26.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.09.2017Appeal received No.  T1947/17
10.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
24.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.04.2008
AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/32]AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE18.04.2015
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU18.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU18.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU18.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT09.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4834063  (HWANG YONG Y [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * column 10, lines 23-64; figures 42-44 * * column 4, lines 57-59 * [Y] 5-7,12;
 [XY]DE19729776  (STEIN INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 10, line 42 - column 11, line 2; figures 2-4 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 2 * [Y] 5-7,12;
 [X]DE3225813  (PROHASKA FRANZ GMBH [AT]) [X] 1 * page 10, lines 2-23; figure 2 *;
 [X]US6323462  (STRAND DAVID [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1690453  (CFS BAKEL BV [NL]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [DX]EP0558151  (KOPPENS MASCHF BV [NL]) [DX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5243962  (HWANG YONG Y [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 6, lines 41-57 *;
 [A]US5673681  (NEITZEL EMERY W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 12-22; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5683240  (SMITH DONALD P [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 27; figure 11 *;
 [A]WO2005027644  (LINCOLN FOODSERVICE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1221575
 EP0558151