Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023515

EP2023515 - Clock management between two end points across packet switched networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avaya Inc.
211 Mount Airy Road
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Avaya Inc.
211 Mount Airy Road
Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
AVAYA TECHNOLOGY LLC
211 Mount Airy Road
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920-2332 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Scholte, Alexander
109 Woy Woy Bay Road
2256 NSW Phegans Bay / AU
02 / Gibbons, Lee D.
1376 Tipperary Street
Boulder 80303 Colorado / US
03 / Tucker, Luke A.
15 Gertrude Street
2100 Beacon Hill NWS / AU
04 / Ong, Mei-Sing
12/691-695 Warringah Road
2087 Forsestville NWS / AU
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Lurgiallee 12
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Hafner-Tergau-Walkenhorst
Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107
60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE
Former [2009/07]Walkenhorst, Andreas
Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date08007763.922.04.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2007083520307.08.2007         Original published format: US 835203
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023515
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/06, H04N7/52
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Taktverwaltung zwischen zwei Endpunkten über Paketnetze[2009/07]
English:Clock management between two end points across packet switched networks[2009/07]
French:Gestion d'horloge entre deux points d'extrémité à travers des réseaux à packets commutés[2014/09]
Former [2009/07]Gestion d'horloge entre deux points limites par l'intermédiaire des réseaux à packets
Examination procedure11.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
12.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/51]
30.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006013263  (FELLMAN RONALD D [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for the use of Video and Audio Coding in DVB services delivered directly over IP protocols European Broadcasting Union Union Européenne de Radio-Télévision EBUÜER; ETSI TS 102 005", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070701), vol. BC, no. V1.3.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014037563 [X] 1-7 * section A.2.8 "Synchronization of content delivered overIP" *
 [AD]  - SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY S CASNER PACKET DESIGN R FREDERICK BLUE COAT SYSTEMS INC V JACOBSON PACKET DESIGN H, "RTP: A Transport Protocol for Real-Time Applications; rfc3550.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20030701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009332 [AD] 1-7 * page 38 *
by applicantUS2006013263