EP1950995 - Authentication of a communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Kugo Kyocera Corporation Yokohama Office 1-1, Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Blood, Marlon, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [2008/31] | Application number, filing date | 08008020.3 | 26.05.2004 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | JP20030152685 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003152685 | JP20030187111 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003187111 | JP20030356499 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003356499 | JP20030399451 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003399451 | JP20040104292 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004104292 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950995 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56, G08G1/0967, G08G1/0968, G08G1/123 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G08G1/005 (EP,US);
G08G1/123 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
H04L63/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/024 (KR,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/42 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/563 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/31] | Title | German: | Authentifizierung eines Kommunikationsendgeräts | [2008/31] | English: | Authentication of a communication terminal | [2008/31] | French: | Authentification d'un terminal de communication | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04012392.9 / EP1482751 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040012392) is 18.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5034596 (UTSUNOMIYA YUKIO [JP]); | [A]US5778322 (RYDBECK NILS RUTGER [US]); | [A]US6047376 (HOSOE MAKOTO [JP]); | [Y]EP1128249 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1209928 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) | Examination | US2003078880 | by applicant | JP2003356499 | JP2003399451 | EP1128249 | EP1209928 | JP2003152685 | JP2003187111 | JP2004104292 |