Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1988623

EP1988623 - D. c. converter, speaker apparatus and d. c. converter control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.06.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2008/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Noro, Masao
c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka / JP
02 / Shimizu, Takanori
c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka / JP
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08008268.830.04.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateJP2007012067401.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007120674
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988623
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988623
Date:14.10.2009
[2009/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/156
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/25]
Former [2008/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gleichspannungsumrichter, Lautsprechervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Gleichspannungsumrichters[2008/45]
English:D. c. converter, speaker apparatus and d. c. converter control method[2008/45]
French:Convertisseur de courant continu, appareil de haut-parleur et procédé de contrôle de convertisseur[2008/45]
Examination procedure08.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
13.04.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.05.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination28.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2154/15
29.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1515422  (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] * [Y] 3,5;
 [Y]JP2001202144  (MELCO INC) [Y] 3 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] *;
 [Y]JP2004104922  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0007] *
by applicantEP1515422
 JP2001202144
 JP2004104922