Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1988623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1988623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 227
14.01.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.01.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.01.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
30.07.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.03.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.11.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.11.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
29.10.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
28.08.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.08.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
29.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
29.06.2015 Means of redress Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.05.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.05.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
24.03.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
19.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.03.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.06.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.02.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
06.02.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.12.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
02.12.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
08.11.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
07.10.2010 Description Search / examination 5
07.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
06.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
06.10.2010 Description Search / examination 5
06.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
31.08.2010 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.05.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.05.2010 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
08.04.2010 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
19.10.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.09.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
08.10.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.07.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.07.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
05.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.05.2008 Drawings Search / examination 4
29.05.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.04.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.2008 Annex Search / examination 4
30.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
30.04.2008 Description Search / examination 16
30.04.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8