Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1988623


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.01.2020 Change: Date of oral proceedings
07.01.2020 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2015 Change: Appeal number
03.11.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
02.09.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
02.09.2015 New entry: Appeal number
28.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
01.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.03.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.02.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.10.2010 Change: Reply to examination report
12.10.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.08.2010 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
28.05.2010 First examination report
22.05.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.05.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  23.06.2010  [2010/25]
18.05.2010 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
23.04.2010 Request for examination filed published on  26.05.2010  [2010/21]
09.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2009 Publication of search report published on  14.10.2009  [2009/42]
03.10.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]