EP1988365 - Methods and systems for displaying airport moving map information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Samuel T. 35023 8th Place, Southwest Federal Way Washington 98023 / US | 02 /
Goodman, William L. 565 Pebble Beach Drive Coupeville Washington 98239 / US | 03 /
Bowe, Roglenda R. 19033 Maxwell Road, Southeast Maple Valley Washington 98038 / US | 04 /
Snow, Michael P. 4350 Witter Road Langley Washington 98260 / US | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Wegener, Markus, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/10] |
Former [2008/45] | Wegener, Markus, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008421.3 | 05.05.2008 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | US20070744671 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 744671 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1988365 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1988365 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1988365 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00, // G09B29/10, G08G5/06, B64D43/02 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
G08G5/51 (EP,US);
G01C23/00 (EP);
G08G5/21 (EP,US);
G08G5/54 (EP,US);
G09B29/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Anzeige von Informationen auf einer beweglichen Flughafenkarte | [2013/38] | English: | Methods and systems for displaying airport moving map information | [2008/45] | French: | Procédés et systèmes d'affichage d'informations cartographiques en mouvement d'un aéroport | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/45] | Verfahren und Systeme zur Anzeige von Informationen aus einer bewegten Flughafenkarte | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2008 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | IE | 05.05.2014 | LU | 05.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | NO | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.05.2008 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | |
NO | 05.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5111400 (YODER EVAN W [US]); | [A]US6694249 (ANDERSON ERIC N [US], et al); | [A]US2004160354 (COLDEFY PIERRE [FR], et al); | [A]US2004225432 (PILLEY HAROLD R [US], et al); | [XA]US2005190079 (HE GANG [US]); | [XAI]US6957130 (HORVATH STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2005283305 (CLARK SAMUEL T [US], et al); | [A]US2006265109 (CANU-CHIESA SIMONA [FR], et al) | by applicant | US5111400 | US2004160354 | US2005190079 | US6957130 |