Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1980526

EP1980526 - Beverage dispensing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Younkle, Matthew C.
1150 North Lake Shore Drive, Apt. 21C
Chicago, IL 60611-1026 / US
[2008/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/42]
Representative(s)Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08008830.515.08.2003
[2008/42]
Priority number, dateUS2003038890713.03.2003         Original published format: US 388907
WO2003US0797214.03.2003         Original published format: PCT/US0307/972
US2003063977111.08.2003         Original published format: US 639771
[2008/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1980526
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:B67D1/14, B05B1/02
[2008/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/42]
TitleGerman:Getränkeausgabevorrichtung[2008/42]
English:Beverage dispensing apparatus[2008/42]
French:Appareil de distribution de boissons[2008/42]
Examination procedure13.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
12.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/20]
04.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/20]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03816397.8  / EP1601608
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200806   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2008
31.08.200907   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0300701  (COOK BERNARD ALFRED) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 31 - line 42; figure 7 * * column 5, line 7 - line 14 *;
 [X]GB898050  (AITKEN OF EDINBURGH BARFITTING) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 12 - line 17; figure 1 *;
 [X]US1654249  (EMIL ERNST) [X] 1-4 * figure 3 * * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 5 *;
 [X]US3129894  (SCHERMERHORN CLARENCE E) [X] 1 * figure 5 *;
 [X]GB484210  (WEBB LAMP COMPANY LTD, et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *