blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2019229

EP2019229 - Stepped transmission with double coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations LLC
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
[2011/30]
Former [2009/05]For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations, Inc.
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit MI 48265-3 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Geiberger, Axel
Holzstrasse 26
55116 Mainz / DE
 [2009/05]
Representative(s)Strauss, Peter
Adam Opel AG Patentrecht, A0-02
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
[2011/41]
Former [2009/05]Strauss, Peter
Adam Opel GmbH Patentrecht, A0-02
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
Application number, filing date08008968.315.05.2008
[2009/05]
Priority number, dateDE2007103455321.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007034553
[2009/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019229
Date:28.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2019229
Date:07.04.2010
[2010/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019229
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:F16H3/00, F16H3/093
[2009/05]
CPC:
F16H3/006 (EP); F16H2003/0931 (EP); F16H2200/0052 (EP);
F16H2312/02 (EP); F16H3/093 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/05]
TitleGerman:Stufengetriebe mit Doppelkupplung[2009/05]
English:Stepped transmission with double coupling[2009/05]
French:Boîte de vitesse à double embrayage[2009/05]
Examination procedure07.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
27.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2011Fee for grant paid
03.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2010
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.05.2008
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU15.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU15.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/22]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/07]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/03]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY12.10.2011
HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/27]HR12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT12.10.2011
NO12.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19911027  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-2,7 * the whole document * [A] 3;
 [A]DE10060699  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4-6 ** figures 4,5a *;
 [A]US2004025612  (AHNERT GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0068] , [0071] , [0079] , [0083] , [0084] * * figures 1,3a,6a,6b *;
 [XA]US2005209042  (JANSON DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0032] - [0034] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,4;
 [A]EP1610023  (AISIN AI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XA]JP2006132572  (EXEDY CORP) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * [A] 2,4;
 [A]WO2007020431  (RICARDO UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-2,7 * page 6, lines 16-27 * * figures 3,4 *
by applicantDE10305241
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.