Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028562

EP2028562 - Developing device, image forming apparatus, image forming system, developing method, and toner bearing member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Yoichi
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
02 / Fukumoto, Takatomo
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08009799.129.05.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateJP2007014406130.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007144061
JP2007014406230.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007144062
JP2007014406530.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007144065
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028562
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028562
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states[2016/38]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Entwicklungsvorrichtung, Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung, Bilderzeugungssystem, Entwicklungsverfahren und Tonerträgerelement[2009/09]
English:Developing device, image forming apparatus, image forming system, developing method, and toner bearing member[2009/09]
French:Dispositif de développement, appareil de formation d'image, système de formation d'image, procédé de développement, et élément de revêtement de toner[2009/09]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
22.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2003057940  (RICOH KK) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * [I] 3,5,7,11-14;
 [A]EP1347345  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0220] - [0225]; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]EP1286229  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0068] - [0073]; figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0140] - [0150]; figures 8-10 *
by applicantJP2007144061
 JP2007144062
 JP2007144065
 JP2006259384
 JP2003057940