Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1997911

EP1997911 - Method for detecting oral squamous-cell carcinoma and method for suppressing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.12.2011  [2011/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Tokyo Medical and Dental University
5-45, Yushima, 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8510 / JP
[2008/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Inazawa, Johji
c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8510 / JP
02 / Imoto, Issei
c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8510 / JP
03 / Suzuki, Emina
c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8510 / JP
 [2008/49]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08009943.530.05.2008
[2008/49]
Priority number, dateJP2007014311030.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007143110
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1997911
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1997911
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2008/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erkennung von oralem Plattenepithelkarzinom und Verfahren zur Unterdrückung desselben[2008/49]
English:Method for detecting oral squamous-cell carcinoma and method for suppressing the same[2008/49]
French:Procédé de détection de carcinome de cellule squameuse orale et son procédé de suppression[2008/49]
Examination procedure20.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/52]
12.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007099209  (CLARKE MICHAEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0444]; table 7b * * paragraph [0213] * * paragraphs [0270] - [0300] *;
 [A]US2003096241  (OKAMOTO TETSUJI [JP]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1092783  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005081867  (UNIV C ALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] * claim - *;
 [X]  WILLIS T G ET AL, "Molecular cloning of translocation t(1;14)(q21;q32) defines a novel gene (BCL9) at chromosome 1q21.", BLOOD 15 MAR 1998, (19980315), vol. 91, no. 6, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1873 - 1881, XP002497570 [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * page 1880 *
 [X]  CROSS S S ET AL, "S100A9 protein is overexpressed in human breast and squamous cell cancers", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, & 186TH MEETING OF THE PATHOLOGICAL-SOCIETY-OF-GREAT-BRITAIN-AND-IRELAN D/DUTCH-PATHOLOGICAL-SOCIETY; AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS; JULY 06 -09, 2004, (200409), vol. 204, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0022-3417, page 46A, XP008096850 [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  AMBROSIO ET AL, "P234 Adam15 gene expression and correlation with 1q21 amplification in head and neck squamous cell carcinomas", 20070501, (20070501), vol. 2, no. 1, page 201, XP022115998 [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  CAI LI-YI ET AL, "Identification of PRTFDC1 silencing and aberrant promoter methylation of GPR150, ITGA8 and HOXD11 in ovarian cancers.", LIFE SCIENCES 27 MAR 2007, (20070327), vol. 80, no. 16, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1458 - 1465, XP008100294 [X] 1-6,9-11 * page 1464, column R *
 [A]  HA ET AL, "Promoter methylation and inactivation of tumour-suppressor genes in oral squamous-cell carcinoma", LANCET ONCOLOGY, LANCET PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20060101), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1470-2045, pages 77 - 82, XP005231742 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(05)70540-4
 [A]  NAKAYA K ET AL, "Identification of homozygous deletions of tumor suppressor gene FAT in oral cancer using CGH-array.", ONCOGENE 9 AUG 2007, (20070226), vol. 26, no. 36, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 5300 - 5308, XP002497569 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.ONC.1210330
 [PX]  SUZUKI E ET AL, "PRTFDC1, a possible tumor-suppressor gene, is frequently silenced in oral squamous-cell carcinomas by aberrant promoter hypermethylation.", ONCOGENE 13 DEC 2007, (20071213), vol. 26, no. 57, ISSN 1476-5594, pages 7921 - 7932, XP002510017 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.ONC.1210589
by applicantJPH0646841
    PARKIN, DM. ET AL., CA CANCER J CLIN., (2002), vol. 55, pages 74 - 108,
    TAKADA H. ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2005), vol. 96, pages 100 - 105,
    INAZAWA J. ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2004), vol. 95, pages 559 - 563,
    BIRD AP ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 99, pages 451 - 454,
    EHRLICH M. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 6694 - 6702,
    Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Mannual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY,
    Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, vol. 1-38,
    GENE, (1991), vol. 108, pages 193 - 200,