Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2009122

EP2009122 - Copper-zinc alloy, method for its manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2018Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieland-Werke AG
Graf-Arco-Strasse 36
89079 Ulm / DE
[2009/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Kai, Dr.
Im Stadtcenter 14
89269 Vöhringen / DE
 [2009/01]
Application number, filing date08010860.814.06.2008
[2009/01]
Priority number, dateDE2007102999128.06.2007         Original published format: DE102007029991
[2009/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2009122
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2009122
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:C22C9/04
[2009/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/01]
TitleGerman:Kupfer-Zink-Legierung, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendung[2009/01]
English:Copper-zinc alloy, method for its manufacture and use[2009/01]
French:Alliage de cuivre et de zinc, procédé de fabrication et utilisation[2009/01]
Examination procedure16.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/10]
02.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2013Observations by third parties
22.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2014Fee for grant paid
16.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14002857.2  / EP2806044
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.07.2015  08.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Otto Fuchs KG
Derschlager Straße 26
58540 Meinerzhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Gartenstrasse 61
58636 Iserlohn / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.2015  08.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Otto Fuchs KG
Derschlager Straße 26
58540 Meinerzhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Patentanwalt
Stefanstraße 2
Kirchhoffgebäude
58638 Iserlohn / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1578/17
19.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2008
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/20]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/11]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/09]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT08.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102005059391  (DIEHL METALL STIFTUNG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 *;
 [YD]DE102005015467  (DIEHL METALL STIFTUNG & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 8-10 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [Y]EP1712648  (DIEHL METALL STIFTUNG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0025] *;
 [X]JPH09316570  (CHUETSU METAL WORKS) [X] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2001355029  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantDE102004058318
 DE102005015467
 DE102005059391
otherDE102005059391
 DE2919478