Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022435

EP2022435 - Medical servicing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2012  [2012/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berchtold Holding GmbH
Ludwigstaler Strasse 25
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Nies, John H., III
2780 Gaston Gate
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 / US
02 / Hand, Barry
808 Milldenhall Road
Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US
03 / Conly, Chris
1273 River Rock Road
Hanahan, SC 29410 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date08010994.517.06.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2007082876226.07.2007         Original published format: US 828762
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022435
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2022435
Date:06.05.2009
[2009/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/02, A61G13/00, A61G12/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Medizinisches Versorgungssystem[2009/07]
English:Medical servicing system[2009/07]
French:Système d'entretien médical[2009/07]
Examination procedure27.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/28]
12.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
03.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/26]
08.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]CA2614658  (CARDINAL HEALTH 303 INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 14, line 12 - page 20, line 13 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2004265112  (NIEUWENHUIS FRANCISCUS JITTE M [NL]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figure - *;
 [X]US2006179571  (NEWKIRK DAVID C [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0233]; figure - *;
 [X]US2007022668  (KASTEN JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0095]; figure - *;
 [A]US2006091269  (HANSON MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0004] *
by applicantUS2003076015