blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1967952

EP1967952 - Method and apparatus for storage backup [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Computer Associates Think, Inc.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, New York 11749 / US
[2008/37]
Inventor(s)01 / McGrattan, Emma K.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
02 / Ball, Stephen
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
03 / Moucaddem, Sami R.
555 Dr. Frederick-Philips Suite 240
St Laurent, Quebec H04M 2X4 / CA
04 / Rivet, Jean-Francois
555 Dr. Frederick-Philips Suite 240
St Laurent, Quebec H04M 2X4 / CA
05 / Yang, Frank H.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
06 / Kuo, Chin L.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
 [2011/03]
Former [2008/37]01 / McGrattan, Emma K.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
02 / Ball, Stephen
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
03 / Moucaddem, Sami R.
555 Dr. Frederick-Philips Suie 240
St Laurent, Quebec H04M 2X4 / CA
04 / Rivet Jean-Francois
555 Dr. Frederick-Philips Suie 240
St Laurent, Quebec H04M 2X4 / CA
05 / Yang Frank H.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
06 / Kuo Chin L.
One Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
Maucher Jenkins
Seventh Floor Offices
Artillery House
11-19 Artillery Row
London SW1P 1RT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2008/37]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date08011041.420.05.2005
[2008/37]
Priority number, dateUS20040573586P21.05.2004         Original published format: US 573586 P
[2008/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1967952
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1967952
Date:29.04.2009
[2009/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1967952
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2009
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/14
[2008/37]
CPC:
G06F11/1453 (EP); G06F11/1451 (EP); G06F11/1456 (EP);
G06F11/1458 (EP); G06F11/1469 (EP); G06F2201/80 (EP);
G06F2201/835 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Speichersicherung[2008/37]
English:Method and apparatus for storage backup[2008/37]
French:Procédé et appareil de sauvegarde de stockage[2008/37]
Examination procedure28.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/50]
06.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2010Fee for grant paid
30.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05752274.0  / EP1754152
Opposition(s)20.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
HU19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
TR19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
GB20.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
LU20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
TR19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
GB20.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
LU20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/25]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
GB20.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
LU20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/30]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
GB20.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/22]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/20]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE20.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/07]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/03]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/49]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/47]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/39]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0520459  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,13 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 15 * * column 6, line 37 - line 49 * * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 3 * * column 17, line 9 - column 20, line 6 * * claims 6,7 * * figures 3,11 *;
 [X]EP0541281  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-7,13 * figures 2-5,8,9 * * column 4, line 46 - column 7, line 58 * * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 40 * * claims 1-4,7 *;
 [X]WO9909480  (TELEBACKUP SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 1-7,13 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 2 * * page 9, line 10 - line 17 * * page 19, line 17 - page 23, line 19 * * page 25, line 1 - line 5 * * figures 5A,/a,/b,/c,14 *;
 [X]EP0899662  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 8-12,14 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] , [0049] - [0053] - [0065] , [0066] , [0086] - [0088] ** figures 3,6 *;
 [X]US5943688  (FISHER JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 8-12,14 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 34 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 62 * * figures 3,4,6 *;
 [X]EP1353273  (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] - [0028] * * claims 13-15,17 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2003200480  (BEATTIE ANDREW M H [GB]) [X] 8-12,14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0032] , [0035] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046] , [0048] , [0051] , [0069] - [0073] - [0088] - [0090] - [0096] * * figures 1,2a,2b,6,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.