Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2031501

EP2031501 - Apparatus for the culture and growth of cells to a three dimensional tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA
[2015/32]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto ON M6S 2X4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holm, Chris
Albrechtstr 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101
6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto Ontario M4K 1J9 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Seyed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / von Schroeder, Herbert P.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
 [2015/32]
Former [2009/35]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holm, Chris
Albrechtstr 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto Ontario M4K 1J9 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Seyed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / von Schroeder, Herbert P.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Former [2009/23]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holmes, Chris
Albrechtstr 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto Ontario M4K 1J9 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Seyed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / von Schroeder, Herbert P.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Former [2009/10]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holmes, Chris
Scheibenstrasse 14
42115 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto Ontario M4K 1J9 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Seyed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / von Schroeder, Herbert P.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12
30161 Hannover / DE
[2014/42]
Former [2014/25](deleted)
...
Former [2009/10]Junius, Walther
Wolfstrasse 24
30519 Hannover-Waldheim / DE
Application number, filing date08011144.619.06.2008
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateUS2007089564527.08.2007         Original published format: US 895645
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031501
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031501
Date:06.05.2009
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2031501
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12M3/00
[2009/19]
Former International [2009/10]G06F9/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2009/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Kultur und Wachstum von Zellen auf einem dreidimensionalen Gewebe[2009/10]
English:Apparatus for the culture and growth of cells to a three dimensional tissue[2009/10]
French:Appareil pour la culture et la croissance de cellules pour un tissu tridimensionnel[2009/10]
Examination procedure27.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
15.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
18.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2015Fee for grant paid
04.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2014
Opposition(s)09.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
11.09.2008Request for further processing filed
11.09.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.09.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201205   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2012
30.06.201407   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
[2017/07]
Former [2017/03]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT05.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005056747  (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 5, line 14 - page 17, line 18 *;
 [A]WO2006088029  (SCHOOL JURIDICAL PERSON KITASA [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2; claims 1,22,23 *;
 [A]WO2006122088  (ISOLAGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 3 - line 14 *
by applicantWO2006088029