Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2031501 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 188
08.06.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.08.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.06.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
26.06.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.03.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.03.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
28.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
28.02.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
10.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.05.2014 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
08.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Description Search / examination 3
06.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.01.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.01.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.08.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.06.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
07.10.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.09.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
19.09.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
18.09.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.09.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.09.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
14.09.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.05.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.04.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
02.04.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
27.02.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.02.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Priority document Search / examination 42
30.09.2008 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
27.08.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of filing/search fee) Search / examination 3
19.06.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
19.06.2008 Description Search / examination 9
19.06.2008 Drawings Search / examination 4
19.06.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6