Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2031501


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
10.06.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
04.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
22.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
03.07.2015 (Expected) grant published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
29.06.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.03.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.02.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2014 Change - representative published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
29.08.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
29.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.05.2014 Change - representative published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
10.02.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.01.2014 First examination report published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
05.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
23.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  13.01.2010  [2010/02]
25.09.2009 Request for examination filed published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
23.09.2009 Amendment by applicant
24.07.2009 Change - inventor published on  26.08.2009  [2009/35]
01.05.2009 Change - inventor published on  03.06.2009  [2009/23]
03.04.2009 Publication of search report published on  06.05.2009  [2009/19]
03.04.2009 Change - classification published on  06.05.2009  [2009/19]
30.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.03.2009  [2009/10]
24.09.2008 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
21.08.2008 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit