blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1978351 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1978351



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1419
19.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
14.06.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.04.2019 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
27.03.2019 Description Appeal 2
27.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.02.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 21
08.02.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.04.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
25.04.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
19.04.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
23.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
21.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
27.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
18.10.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
04.07.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 32
09.05.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.05.2016 Claims Appeal 16
09.05.2016 Claims Appeal 2
09.05.2016 Claims Appeal 14
09.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
09.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 32
04.05.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2016 Claims Appeal 32
04.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
24.03.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 27
12.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.11.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
26.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
30.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
21.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
19.05.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
19.05.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 32
19.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
25.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
24.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 6
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
25.02.2014 Drawings Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
25.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.02.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
24.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
17.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
06.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
30.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.04.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
28.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.01.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
21.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
11.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.01.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
07.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.08.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
25.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
25.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.11.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.10.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.10.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.10.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 7
24.06.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.06.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
14.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
14.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
14.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
22.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
10.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.02.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.01.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2011 Description Search / examination 3
14.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 7
05.11.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
14.04.2010 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
08.04.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.03.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 53
23.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2009 Description Search / examination 6
09.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.09.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
31.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.05.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
27.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.03.2009 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.10.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.10.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.10.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 5
15.09.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
12.09.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.09.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.09.2008 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.07.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
23.06.2008 Description Search / examination 31
23.06.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
23.06.2008 Drawings Search / examination 7
23.06.2008 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
23.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
23.06.2008 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
20.02.2001 Priority document Search / examination 20
03.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28