blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1978351


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Change - inventor
11.06.2019 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
09.04.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2017 Opposition withdrawn published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
21.10.2016 Change - applicant published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
01.10.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
25.07.2014 Change: Appeal number
25.07.2014 New entry: Appeal number
25.07.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
19.05.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
05.03.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2014 Change - representative published on  26.03.2014  [2014/13]
03.12.2013 Change: Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2013 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.05.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.01.2013 Change - representative published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
16.01.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.10.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
07.09.2012 Opposition filed published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
28.10.2011 (Expected) grant published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
26.10.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.10.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.06.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.06.2011 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2011 Change - classification published on  29.06.2011  [2011/26]
27.05.2011 Change - classification published on  29.06.2011  [2011/26]
04.02.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2011 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
21.01.2011 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
21.01.2011 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
17.01.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.11.2010 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  24.11.2010  [2010/47]
23.07.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.05.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.04.2010 Change - applicant published on  26.05.2010  [2010/21]
02.04.2010 Change - applicant published on  05.05.2010  [2010/18]
18.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.11.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.09.2009 Change - applicant published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
04.09.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
27.08.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
18.05.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
24.04.2009 First examination report
21.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2009 Request for examination filed published on  06.05.2009  [2009/19]
03.10.2008 Change - inventor published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
12.09.2008 Publication of search report published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
12.09.2008 Change - inventor published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
05.09.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2008  [2008/41]
03.07.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid