blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1978351 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP03738941 EP03753099 EP03753106 EP04813858 EP05016677 EP05849156 EP07120202 EP08011345 EP10012503 EP10075604

More

EP11193359 EP12156268 EP13184168 EP14167180 EP16150671 EP16172036 EP17190044 EP99924365



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2006052682Global Dossier 03.08.2006A3
WO2006052682 18.05.2006A2
Priority number Date
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2005059525Global Dossier 30.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
US73533903 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO03098279Global Dossier 08.04.2004A3
WO03098279 27.11.2003A2
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO03098278Global Dossier 12.02.2004A3
WO03098278 27.11.2003A2
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO03098277Global Dossier 21.10.2004A8
WO03098277 10.06.2004A3
WO03098277 27.11.2003A2
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016305881Global Dossier 20.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US98144004 04.11.2004
US201213619679 14.09.2012
US201615065834 09.03.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016178522Global Dossier 23.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US80415107 17.05.2007
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US33348206 17.01.2006
US33348306 17.01.2006
US70053601 29.11.2001
US201614997883 18.01.2016
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016178521Global Dossier 23.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US80415107 17.05.2007
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US33348206 17.01.2006
US201614997832 18.01.2016
US33348306 17.01.2006
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014045187Global Dossier 13.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US44092003 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US201314054729 15.10.2013
US21662002 09.08.2002
US21741008 03.07.2008
US40915202 09.09.2002
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011159549Global Dossier 30.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US89584810 30.09.2010
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US64441006 22.12.2006
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2010216143Global Dossier 26.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
US64200909 18.12.2009
US38167102 17.05.2002
US44085203 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007154939Global Dossier 05.07.2007A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US71141607 26.02.2007
US37084603 20.02.2003
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007148761Global Dossier 28.06.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70585607 13.02.2007
US9278498 14.07.1998
US37084603 20.02.2003
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007105212Global Dossier 10.05.2007A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US64441006 22.12.2006
US9911088 17.05.1999
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005279949Global Dossier 22.12.2005A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9823195Global Dossier 21.11.2017B2
US2013143310 06.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US201313748508 23.01.2013
US8576598 16.05.1998
US45619603 06.06.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US32183009 26.01.2009
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9719925Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2015293024 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US64200909 18.12.2009
US38167102 17.05.2002
US44085203 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
US201514741319 16.06.2015
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9671342Global Dossier 06.06.2017B2
US2007238161 11.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US80415107 17.05.2007
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US33348206 17.01.2006
US33348306 17.01.2006
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9285318Global Dossier 15.03.2016B2
US2013034859 07.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US73533903 12.12.2003
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US98144004 04.11.2004
US201213619679 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9273353Global Dossier 01.03.2016B2
US2015322488 12.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US80415107 17.05.2007
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US33348206 17.01.2006
US33348306 17.01.2006
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US201514730989 04.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8921098Global Dossier 30.12.2014B2
US2006199259 07.09.2006A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US37084603 20.02.2003
US40614806 18.04.2006
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8809040Global Dossier 19.08.2014B2
US2012087832 12.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
US64200909 18.12.2009
US38167102 17.05.2002
US44085203 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
US201113333788 21.12.2011
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8557569Global Dossier 15.10.2013B2
US2009009767 08.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US44092003 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US21741008 03.07.2008
US40915202 09.09.2002
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8557566Global Dossier 15.10.2013B2
US2006128009 15.06.2006A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US33348306 17.01.2006
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8492138Global Dossier 23.07.2013B2
US2013011848 10.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
US44092003 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US201213611462 12.09.2012
US21741008 03.07.2008
US40915202 09.09.2002
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8361785Global Dossier 29.01.2013B2
US2009141272 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US45619603 06.06.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US32183009 26.01.2009
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7635588Global Dossier 22.12.2009B2
US2004014202 22.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US44085203 19.05.2003
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7599060Global Dossier 06.10.2009B2
US2008316482 25.12.2008A1
Priority number Date
US22282008 18.08.2008
US21662002 09.08.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
US98144004 04.11.2004
US26511005 03.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7498164Global Dossier 03.03.2009B2
US2004009586 15.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US45619603 06.06.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7423750Global Dossier 09.09.2008B2
US2006121602 08.06.2006A1
Priority number Date
US21662002 09.08.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US98144004 04.11.2004
US26511005 03.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7410793Global Dossier 12.08.2008B2
US2004072335 15.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US44092003 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7387891Global Dossier 17.06.2008B2
US2004038390 26.02.2004A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US44071903 19.05.2003
US70053601 29.11.2001
US45073403 28.02.2003
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7348573Global Dossier 25.03.2008B2
US2007008537 11.01.2007A1
Priority number Date
US73533903 12.12.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
US53154806 13.09.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7183103Global Dossier 27.02.2007B2
US2003148505 07.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US37084603 20.02.2003
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7119345Global Dossier 10.10.2006B2
US2004178357 16.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
US73533903 12.12.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014081391Global Dossier 08.05.2014A
Priority number Date
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2011059134Global Dossier 24.03.2011A
Priority number Date
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2008519266Global Dossier 05.06.2008A
Priority number Date
WO2005US39839 03.11.2005
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005526254Global Dossier 02.09.2005A
Priority number Date
US0315945 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005526253Global Dossier 02.09.2005A
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315941 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005526252Global Dossier 02.09.2005A
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315798 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003524754Global Dossier 19.08.2003A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6050529BGlobal Dossier 21.12.2016B2
JP2016076501 12.05.2016A
Priority number Date
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3312594Global Dossier 25.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
EP11193359 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
EP16150671 19.05.2003
EP14167180 19.05.2003
US0315941 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
EP03738941 19.05.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3093649Global Dossier 08.05.2019B1
EP3093649 26.04.2017A3
EP3093649 16.11.2016A2
Priority number Date
EP08011345 17.05.1999
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
EP10012503 17.05.1999
US9911088 17.05.1999
EP99924365 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3035037Global Dossier 13.09.2017B1
EP3035037 22.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
EP11193359 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
EP14167180 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
EP03738941 19.05.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2775291Global Dossier 13.01.2016B1
EP2775291 10.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
EP11193359 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
EP03738941 19.05.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2674745Global Dossier 13.04.2016B1
EP2674745 18.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
EP03753106 19.05.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2463644Global Dossier 09.10.2013B1
EP2463644 13.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
EP03753099 19.05.2003
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2444793Global Dossier 07.05.2014B1
EP2444793 25.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
EP03738941 19.05.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2315002Global Dossier 05.12.2012A3
EP2315002 27.04.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP08011345 17.05.1999
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
EP99924365 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2306233Global Dossier 20.07.2011A3
EP2306233 06.04.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP05849156 03.11.2005
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1890182Global Dossier 20.02.2008A2
Priority number Date
EP05849156 03.11.2005
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1807726Global Dossier 27.04.2016B1
EP1807726 18.07.2007A2
Priority number Date
WO2005US39839 03.11.2005
US98144004 04.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1692492Global Dossier 09.02.2011B1
EP1692492 23.08.2006A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US41600 13.12.2004
US73533903 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1619491Global Dossier 11.03.2009B1
EP1619491 25.01.2006A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
EP99924365 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1511991Global Dossier 06.05.2015B1
EP1511991 20.04.2011A4
EP1511991 09.03.2005A2
Priority number Date
US0315945 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1511990Global Dossier 25.03.2015B1
EP1511990 09.12.2009A4
EP1511990 09.03.2005A2
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315798 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1506390Global Dossier 14.12.2011B1
EP1506390 02.12.2009A4
EP1506390 16.02.2005A2
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315941 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1078245Global Dossier 06.08.2008B1
EP1078245 28.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1978351Global Dossier 30.11.2011B1
EP1978351 15.10.2008A3
EP1978351 08.10.2008A2
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
EP99924365 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT498122T 15.02.2011T
Priority number Date
WO2004US41600 13.12.2004
US73533903 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT537438T 15.12.2011T
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315941 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU759974B 01.05.2003B2
AU4088499 06.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003243268 02.12.2003A8
AU2003243268 02.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315798 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003243281 02.12.2003A8
AU2003243281 02.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0315945 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003245302 02.12.2003A8
AU2003245302 02.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38167102 17.05.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US0315941 19.05.2003
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2328609 25.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2566924 29.11.2011C
CA2566924 25.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
CA2328609 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69939259D 18.09.2008D1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE602004031358D 24.03.2011D1
Priority number Date
WO2004US41600 13.12.2004
US73533903 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2543587T 20.08.2015T3
Priority number Date
US0315945 19.05.2003
US38167102 17.05.2002
US21662002 09.08.2002
US40915202 09.09.2002
US45073403 28.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6818437 16.11.2004B1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7008789 07.03.2006B2
US2002192808 19.12.2002A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US21662002 09.08.2002
US8576598 16.05.1998
US70053601 29.11.2001
US9911088 17.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9960381Global Dossier 25.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2016195602Global Dossier 24.11.2016A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2013178254Global Dossier 09.09.2013A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2011039071Global Dossier 24.02.2011A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2009002955Global Dossier 08.01.2009A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2005274579Global Dossier 06.10.2005A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5881226BGlobal Dossier 09.03.2016B2
JP2015072285 16.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT403856T 15.08.2008T
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT425448T 15.03.2009T
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1201016C 11.05.2005C
CN1309766 22.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1664562 07.09.2005A
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69940574D 23.04.2009D1
Priority number Date
US9278498 14.07.1998
US8576598 16.05.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2315002
 EP3093649
TypeType Earlier application
 EP1078245