blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1978351

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure21.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
European patent granted30.11.2011
Opposition procedure19.05.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
Appeal following opposition21.07.2014APPEAL FILED
26.09.2014APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
07.06.2019APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:08.10.2008 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1078245
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:08.10.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GAMBINI, MICHAEL R.
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ATWOOD, JOHN G.
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:YOUNG, EUGENE F.
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:LAKATOS, EDWARD J.
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:CERRONE, ANTHONY L.
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GAMBINI, MICHAEL R.
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ATWOOD, JOHN G.
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:YOUNG, EUGENE F.
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:LAKATOS, EDWARD J.
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:CERRONE, ANTHONY L.
 
Event date:06.05.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20090326
 
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090427
 
Event date:24.06.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:05.05.2010 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
 
Event date:26.05.2010 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
 
Event date:29.06.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 21/64 20060101AFI20110524BHEP
 
Event date:29.06.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 21/03 20060101ALI20110524BHEP
 
Event date:29.06.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B01L 7/00 20060101ALI20110524BHEP
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1078245
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:02.02.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 69943902 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20120202
 
Event date:10.10.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS INTERNATIONAL AG
Effective DATE:20120825
 
Event date:29.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 69943902 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20120825
 
Event date:12.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
 
Event date:13.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:11.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180502
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180411
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181115
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:17.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69943902 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:05.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190516
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:LAKATOS, EDWARD J.
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:YOUNG, EUGENE F.
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ATWOOD, JOHN G.
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:CERRONE, ANTHONY L.
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GAMBINI, MICHAEL R.