Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1978351

EP1978351 - Instrument for monitoring polymerase chain reaction of dna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.10.2011
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2016/47]
Former [2010/21]For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Alley Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Former [2009/44]For all designated states
Applera Corporation
301 Merritt 7
Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Applera Corporation
301 Merritt 7
Norwalk, CT 06851-1070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gambini, Michael R.
181 Josiesing Road
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
02 / Young, Eugene F.
4061 Tritt Homestead Drive
Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US
03 / Lakatos, Edward J.
56 Ridgedale Road
Bethel, CT 06801 / US
04 / Cerrone, Anthony L.
51 Kneeland Road
New Haven, CT / US
 [2011/48]
Former [2008/45]01 / Gambini, Michael R.
181 Josiesing Road
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
02 / Young, Eugene F.
4061 Tritt Homestead Drive
Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US
03 / Lakatos, Edward J.
56 Ridgedale Road
Bethel, CT 06801 / US
04 / Cerrone, Anthony L.
51 Kneeland Road
New Haven, CT / US
Former [2008/42]01 / Gambini, Michael R.
181 Josiesing Road
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
02 / Atwood, John G.
149 Limekiln Road
Redding, CT 06896 / US
03 / Young, Eugene F.
4061 Tritt Homestead Drive
Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US
04 / Lakatos, Edward J.
56 Ridgedale Road
Bethel, CT 06801 / US
05 / Cerrone, Anthony L.
51 Kneeland Road
New Haven, CT / US
Former [2008/41]01 / Gambini, Michael R.
181 Josiesing Road
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
02 / Atwood, John G.
149 Limekiln Road
Redding, CT 06896 / US
03 / Young, Eugene F.
4061 Tritt Homestead Drive
Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US
04 / Lakatos, Edward J.
56 Ridgedale Road
Bethel, CT 06801 / US
05 / Cerrone, Anthony L.
51 Kneeland Road
New Haven, CT / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/09]Wöhler, Christian , et al
Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2011/48]Roberts, Mark Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/41]Roberts, Mark Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08011345.917.05.1999
[2008/41]
Priority number, dateUS19980085765P16.05.1998         Original published format: US 85765 P
US19980092784P14.07.1998         Original published format: US 92784 P
[2008/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1978351
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1978351
Date:15.10.2008
[2008/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1978351
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01N21/03, B01L7/00
[2011/48]
Former International [2008/41]G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/26]
Former [2008/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Instrument zur Überwachung der Polymerase-Kettenreaktion von DNS[2008/41]
English:Instrument for monitoring polymerase chain reaction of dna[2008/41]
French:Instrument de surveillance de la réaction de la polymérase en chaîne de l'adn[2008/41]
Examination procedure26.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
16.04.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2011Fee for grant paid
21.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99924365.2  / EP1078245
Divisional application(s)EP10012503.8  / EP2315002
EP16172036.2  / EP3093649
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990924365) is  20.01.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  WITHDRAWN
Roche Diagnostics International AG
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Opponent's representative
Durm Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Moltkestrasse 45
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/22]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  WITHDRAWN
Roche Diagnostics International AG
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Opponent's representative
Durm & Partner
Patentanwälte
Moltkestrasse 45
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [2012/41]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics International AG
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Opponent's representative
Durm & Partner
Patentanwälte
Moltkestrasse 45
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
09.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.05.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1607/14
26.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
07.06.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.01.2011Request for further processing filed
14.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.01.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE19748211  (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [PX] 1-17 * figure 2 *;
 [X]WO9605488  (SCIENCE APPLIC INT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figure 2B *;
 [A]WO9734171  (JOHNSON KENNETH C [US]) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19651667  (GROSKOPF RUDOLF DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5635402  (ALFANO ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5527684  (MABILE MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - VOLCKER M ET AL, "MIKROSKOPGESTUTZTE FLUORESZENZ-PHOTONEN-KORRELATION", TECHNISCHES MESSEN TM, R.OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19960401), vol. 63, no. 4, ISSN 0171-8096, pages 128 - 135, XP000584186 [A] 1-17 * figures 6,8,10 *
ExaminationEP0686699
 JPH0866199
    - HIGUCHI R ET AL, "KINETIC PCR ANALYSIS: REAL-TIME MONITORING OF DNA AMPLIFICATION REACTIONS", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (19930901), vol. 11, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1038/NBT0993-1026, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 1026 - 1030, XP000197685

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0993-1026
by applicantUS4683202
 US5766889
 US5475610
 US5656493
    - RUSSEL HIGUCHI ET AL., "Kinetic PCR Analysis: Real-time Monitoring of DNA Amplification Reactions", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (199309), vol. 11, pages 1026 - 1030
    - KIRK M. RIRIE ET AL., "Product Differentiation by Analysis of DNA Melting Curves during the Polymerase Chain Reaction", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 245, pages 154 - 160