Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1994937 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1994937



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 4519
11.11.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
25.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
19.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.05.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
06.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Request for a change of address - opponent Opposition 1
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
27.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.04.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
04.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.03.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
30.03.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
29.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
29.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
29.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
29.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
04.03.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 4
17.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
12.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
22.09.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
17.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
28.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
17.08.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
13.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
07.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
31.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
31.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
31.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
07.08.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
16.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 100
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 52
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 47
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
16.04.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
16.04.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 56
16.04.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 33
16.04.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 64
06.12.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
03.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 3
03.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 90
03.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
03.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
03.12.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 38
10.10.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
10.10.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.10.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.10.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
24.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 23
24.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
24.06.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.06.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.06.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.06.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
03.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 40
03.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.05.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.05.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 100
13.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 47
13.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.05.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
10.05.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
10.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 34
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 31
10.04.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.04.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
10.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 204
10.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
09.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 45
09.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 44
09.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
09.04.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 34
08.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 28
12.11.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
08.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.07.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 28
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.05.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
14.05.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
12.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.10.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Authorisation Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 18
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
29.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 114
29.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
29.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
27.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
27.09.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.09.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.09.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
27.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 52
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 212
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 92
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 196
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
27.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.12.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.12.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Opposition 2
22.10.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.10.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.06.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.06.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.06.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.06.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 101
18.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
18.05.2010 Description Search / examination 25
18.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
17.05.2010 Description Search / examination 25
17.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.03.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
26.03.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.03.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 12
26.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
26.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
26.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
26.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
26.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
22.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
22.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 6
20.11.2008 European search report Search / examination 7
29.10.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.09.2008 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 5
05.09.2008 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 2
08.07.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2008 Description Search / examination 83
26.06.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Drawings Search / examination 15
26.06.2008 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
26.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
24.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 101
24.06.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
24.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 10
28.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
28.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 46