Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2139100

EP2139100 - Permanent magnet synchronous machine with reduced cogging torque [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2013  [2013/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
[2013/11]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grossmann, Udo
Am Kolmberg 8
97640 Oberstreu / DE
02 / Vollmer, Rolf
Espenlaubstrasse 13
36129 Gersfeld / DE
03 / Zastrow, Michael
Endgrube 11
97616 Salz / DE
 [2010/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/44]
Application number, filing date08011716.127.06.2008
[2010/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2139100
Date:30.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2139100
Date:31.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H02K29/03, H02K1/27, // H02K21/16
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2010/36]
Former [2010/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Permanentmagneterregte Synchronmaschine mit reduzierter Drehmomentenwelligkeit[2010/01]
English:Permanent magnet synchronous machine with reduced cogging torque[2010/01]
French:Machine synchrone à aimants permanents dotée d'une ondulation de couple réduite[2010/01]
Examination procedure27.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
01.07.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2012Fee for grant paid
06.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2010
Opposition(s)01.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.01.2011Request for further processing filed
17.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004109894  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2 * * page 3, line 7 - line 10 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE10348401  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102005022548  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0044] *;
 [A]EP1389821  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2006029990  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 11, line 17 - line 31 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9116754  (TOEROEK VILMOS [SE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 11 - line 15 * * page 6, line 1 - line 26 * * page 8, line 1 - line 21 * * page 12, line 13 - line 30 *;
 [A]US2006290220  (IONEL DAN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] *
 [A]  NICOLA BIANCHI ET AL, "Design Techniques for Reducing the Cogging Torque in Surface-Mounted PM Motors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020901), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0093-9994, XP011073515 [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004109894