Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025578

EP2025578 - Method for setting the steering angle of an electronically steered axle of a commercial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2010  [2010/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WABCO GmbH
Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Heuer, Bernd
Jaegerweg 14
31171 Nordstemmen / DE
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date08011826.801.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103857516.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007038575
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025578
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B62D6/00, B62D7/15, B62D61/10
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Einstellen eines Lenkwinkels einer elektronisch gelenkten Achse eines Nutzfahrzeuges[2009/08]
English:Method for setting the steering angle of an electronically steered axle of a commercial vehicle[2009/08]
French:Procédé de réglage d'un angle de braquage d'un essieu directrice par commande électronique d'un véhicule utilitaire[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
17.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/29]
03.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/29]
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE10310942  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0025] , [0026] * [Y] 3,4;
 [Y]DE10328685  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0032] *;
 [X]EP0678439  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * page 4, lines 41-49 * * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 30 * * claim 7 *;
 [A]US2003060959  (LIN WILLIAM CHIN-WOEI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] *;
 [A]DE4123232  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, lines 21-37 *;
 [A]DE10108421  (SEUSER ULRICH H [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 5 *