Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2031043

EP2031043 - Fuel composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.12.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG
Badstrasse 115
71336 Waiblingen / DE
[2009/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Schweiger, Stefan, Dr.
Kernenweg 85
73732 Esslingen / DE
02 / Wedel, Christina, Dr.
Gänsfussweg 5
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
03 / Ehmann, Konrad
Geradstettener Str. 39
73630 Remshalden / DE
04 / Lochmann, Holger, Dr.
Melissenweg 3/1
71334 Waiblingen / DE
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Wasmuth, Rolf , et al
Patentanwälte
Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]Wasmuth, Rolf , et al
Patentanwalt W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date08011970.403.07.2008
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateDE2007103550028.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007035500
[2009/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031043
Date:04.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031043
Date:07.07.2010
[2010/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2031043
Date:08.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/02, C10L1/06
[2009/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2011/11]
Former [2009/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffzusammensetzung[2009/10]
English:Fuel composition[2009/10]
French:Composition de carburant[2009/10]
Examination procedure15.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
08.01.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.02.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
29.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2013Fee for grant paid
22.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13005474.5  / EP2700702
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lantmännen Aspen AB
Iberovägen 2
438 54 Hindas / SE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lantmännen Aspen AB
Iberovägen 2
438 54 Hindas / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lantmännen Aspen AB
Iberovägen 2
438 54 Hindas / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  08.10.2014   
Lantmännen Aspen AB
Iberovägen 2
438 54 Hindas / SE
Opponent's representative
Mellgren, Maria Charlotta
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
18.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.09.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2515/16
06.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB1293085  (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, line 50 - line 89 * * example .; table . * [I] 3,6-11;
 [XI]FR1415911  (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO) [X] 1,2,4,5 * table 1 * [I] 3,6-11;
 [XI]US2006131209  (TIMKEN HYE KYUNG C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * example 7; tables 5,6 * [I] 3,5-11
by applicantGB465459
 GB1293085
 FR1415911
 US2006131209
Opposition   - SVENSK STANDARD SS 15 54 61
    - KWF-TEST für Sonderkraftstoffe
    - Analysis Report
    - pages from R. Stone, Introduction to Internal Combustion Engines