Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020584

EP2020584 - Method and system for firing a revolver cannon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Air Defence AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
[2009/12]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Prorok, Jacek, Dr.
Im Brünnli 8
8152 Opfikon / CH
02 / Kressibucher, Peter
Weidstrasse 36
8105 Watt / CH
03 / Gerber, Michael
Azurstrasse 7
8050 Zürich / CH
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2009/06]Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08011974.603.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103645701.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007036457
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020584
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020584
Date:07.03.2012
Language:DE
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020584
Date:04.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:F41A19/04, F41A19/66, // F41A19/59, F41A19/52, F41A19/68
[2012/10]
Former International [2009/06]F41A19/59
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Schussauslösung bei einer Revolverkanone[2009/06]
English:Method and system for firing a revolver cannon[2009/06]
French:Procédé et agencement de déclenchement de coup pour un canon-révolver[2009/06]
Examination procedure04.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
21.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2015Fee for grant paid
22.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2013
Opposition(s)07.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.07.2008
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
AT03.07.2015
IE03.07.2015
LU03.07.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/22]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
AT03.07.2015
IE03.07.2015
LU03.07.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/50]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
AT03.07.2015
IE03.07.2015
LU03.07.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IE03.07.2015
LU03.07.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/15]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
LU03.07.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/13]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/41]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/39]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/36]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/35]ES04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/33]ES04.03.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]DE313166  (KRAL) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE312236  (KRAL) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2448024  (GOLDEN WILLIAM T) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 15 - line 31; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]US5485776  (EALOVEGA GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 19 - line 39 * * column 5, line 64 - line 67; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE2018620  (RHEINMETALL) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *
by applicantDE8615877U
 US3103758
 US3496829