Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020376

EP2020376 - ISO palettising for a gun [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Air Defence AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
[2009/12]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Trigo, Marcos
Bahnhofstrasse 55
6312 Steinhausen / CH
02 / Gerber, Michael
Azurstrasse 7
8050 Zürich / CH
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2009/06]
Application number, filing date08011975.303.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103645801.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007036458
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020376
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020376
Date:29.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:B63B3/70, F41A23/52, // B60P7/13, B63G1/00
[2012/09]
Former International [2009/06]B63B3/70, B63B25/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:ISO-Palettierung für ein Geschütz[2009/06]
English:ISO palettising for a gun[2009/06]
French:Dépalettisation ISO pour une pièce d'artillerie[2009/06]
Examination procedure15.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
24.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/24]
16.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE9004681U  (CONTRAVES) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 4-6 [Y] 3;
 [YA]US4844672  (YURGEVICH HOWARD J [US]) [Y] 2 * column 3, lines 25-29; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 4-6;
 [YA]US3317236  (CONNERAT EDWIN B, et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 43; figures 5-8 * [A] 4-6;
 [A]GB1494729  (COLE E) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3027025  (TANTLINGER KEITH W) [A] 2-6 * column 7, line 8 - line 51; figures 17-19 *
 [X]  "Weapons systems in ISO containers", MARINE ENGINEERS REVIEW, Warley, West Midlands Great Britain, (198208), no. August, pages 20 - 21, XP002667794 [X] 1,2 * the whole document *
 [A]  "Standard Flex 300; The True Multi-role Ship", STANDARD FLEX 300. TRUE MULTI-ROLE SHIP,, (19920301), pages 1 - 15, XP002265302 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantDE10254786