Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020668

EP2020668 - Vacuum insulated switch and vacuum insulated switchgear [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/37]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Masato
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Tsuchiya, Kenji
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Yamazaki, Miki
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
04 / Morita, Ayumu
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
 [2015/37]
Former [2009/06]01 / Kobayashi, Masato
c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Tsuchiya, Kenji
c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Yamazaki, Miki
c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
04 / Morita, Ayumu
c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2015/37]
Former [2009/06]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08012040.503.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateJP2007019750730.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007197507
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020668
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020668
Date:25.11.2009
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020668
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01H33/666, H01H33/662, H01H1/20
[2015/11]
Former International [2009/06]H01H33/66, // H01H1/20
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2015/37]
Former [2010/30]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  LI,  NL 
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vakuumisolierter Schalter und Antrieb[2015/12]
English:Vacuum insulated switch and vacuum insulated switchgear[2009/06]
French:Interrupteur isolé sous vide et appareillage de commutation isolé sous vide[2009/06]
Former [2009/06]Vakuumisolierter Schalter und vakuumisoliertes Schaltgetriebe
Examination procedure30.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/20]
26.05.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.07.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.06.2015Fee for grant paid
23.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2013
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3026197  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3803065  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1251539  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0026]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US3920941  (HUNDSTAD RICHARD L) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3562574  (WESOLOSKI HENRY J) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 *
by applicantJP2007014086
 DE3026197